Phears v. LVNV Funding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlos A Phears and Carlos A. Phears
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Service, L.P. and Credit Control, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02843
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal Defendants LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, LP, and Credit Control, LLC's Statement Concerning Removal filed by Credit Control, LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Service, L.P..(Barnes, Jonathan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Resurgent Capital Service, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Alegis Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Resurgent Holdings, LLC for Resurgent Capital Service, L.P..(Barnes, Jonathan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Credit Control, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Credit Control Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Lloyds, London (Brit Syndicate) for Credit Control, LLC.(Barnes, Jonathan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by LVNV Funding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sherman Originator, LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC.(Barnes, Jonathan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Carlos A. Phears (c/m 10/8/2020 ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim by Credit Control, LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Service, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1)(Whitelock, Julia)
October 1, 2020 Deficiency Notice for Credit Control, LLC and LVNV Funding, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/8/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Correspondence from Clerk to Plaintiff re: Removal of Case (c/m 10/1/2020 ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/1/2020. (c/m 10/1/2020 ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF MARYLAND FOR HOWARD COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0416-8889567(Whitelock, Julia)
October 1, 2020 The case of Phears v. LVNV Funding, LLC et al, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is RDB-20-2843. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 15 days as to Credit Control, LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Credit Control, LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Service, L.P., filed by Carlos A. Phears. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Howard County, case number D-101-cv-20-010092., filed by Credit Control, LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Complaint (state court), #3 Exhibit 2 Summons LVNV (state court), #4 Exhibit 3 Summons Credit Control (state court))(Whitelock, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phears v. LVNV Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A Phears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Phears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Barnes
Represented By: Julia K Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Service, L.P.
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Barnes
Represented By: Julia K Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Control, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Barnes
Represented By: Julia K Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?