Young v. Frosh
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Brian Frosh
Case Number: 1:2020cv02935
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/10/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/em via consent NEF plaintff)
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/10/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/em via consent NEF plaintff)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration of #5 Memorandum Opinion and #6 Order by Huguette Nicole Young, and Proposed Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Proposed Amended Complaint, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing complaint without prejudice; denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #4 Motion for Speedy Hearing; closing case. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/20/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/NEF 10/20/20)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/20/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/NEF 10/20/20)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for speedy hearing by Huguette Nicole Young. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Huguette Nicole Young. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Frosh, filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment, #3 Proposed Summons and USMS Form)(dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Frosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Frosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?