Antevorta Capital Partners LTD v Continental Beverage Brands Corporation
Plaintiff: Antevorta Capital Partners LTD
Defendant: Continental Beverage Brands Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02965
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/16/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 Fairness Hearing held ( via teleconference ) on 11/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner.(FTR - J. Klein 5B.) (jks, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Rescheduling the Fairness Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/2/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Fairness Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 10/22/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/21/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for to conduct a Fairness Hearing. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/20/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion To Schedule Fairness Hearing Before Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/20/2020. (vals, Chambers)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Other Relief to Schedule Fairness Hearing Before Magistrate by Continental Beverage Brands Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stout, Matheau)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Stout, Matheau)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Continental Beverage Brands Corporation (Stout, Matheau)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Continental Beverage Brands Corporation.(Stout, Matheau)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Continental Beverage Brands Corporation.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Antevorta Capital Partners LTD (Allen, Glen)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Antevorta Capital Partners LTD (Allen, Glen)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Antevorta Capital Partners LTD re #1 Complaint, (Allen, Glen)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antevorta Capital Partners LTD, Continental Beverage Brands Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8909618.), filed by Antevorta Capital Partners LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Allen, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antevorta Capital Partners LTD v Continental Beverage Brands Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antevorta Capital Partners LTD
Represented By: Glen Keith Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Beverage Brands Corporation
Represented By: Matheau J. W. Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?