Harvey v. Cable News Network, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Derek J. Harvey
Defendant: Lev Parnas, Joseph A. Bondy and Cable News Network, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03068
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Derek J. Harvey. Lev Parnas waiver sent on 11/6/2020, answer due 1/5/2021.(Meadows, Joseph)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Derek J. Harvey. Cable News Network, Inc. waiver sent on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020.(Meadows, Joseph)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Derek J. Harvey. Joseph A. Bondy waiver sent on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020.(Meadows, Joseph)
October 23, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) Summons Issued 21 days as to Joseph A. Bondy, Cable News Network, Inc., Lev Parnas.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/22/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Derek J. Harvey re #1 Complaint Summonses in a Civil Action for CNN, Lev Parnas and Joseph A. Bondy (Meadows, Joseph)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Derek J. Harvey was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8923562.), filed by Derek J. Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meadows, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Cable News Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lev Parnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Bondy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable News Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek J. Harvey
Represented By: Joseph Lee Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?