Collins v. John Doe 1 et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Collins
Defendant: Department of Public Safety Correctional Service, John Doe 3, John Doe 2, Inmate Grievance Office, Western Correctional Instiution, John Doe 4 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 1:2020cv03107
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time til January 15th 2021. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/15/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR- MOTION for Extension of Time by Daniel Collins(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time by Daniel Collins (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time til December 15, 2020. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/17/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by Daniel Collins (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER giving Plaintiff 28 days from the date of this Order to submit a supplement to the Complaint and also to pay the filing fee or to file a Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/28/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-10/28/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Public Safety Correctional Service, Inmate Grievance Office, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, Western Correctional Instiution, filed by Daniel Collins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. John Doe 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety Correctional Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate Grievance Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Correctional Instiution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?