Buettner-Hartsoe et al v. Baltimore Lutheran High School Association d/b/a Concordia Preparatory School
Plaintiff: N.H., a minor and Donna Buettner-Hartsoe
Defendant: Baltimore Lutheran High School Association doing business as Concordia Preparatory School
Case Number: 1:2020cv03132
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore Lutheran High School Association identifying Other Affiliate Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Baltimore Lutheran High School Association d/b/a Concordia Preparatory School for Baltimore Lutheran High School Association.(Driver, Lauren)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Baltimore Lutheran High School Association was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled. Everyone designated on your disclosure statement as having financial interest in the outcome of the case needs to be added as a corporate parent or other affiliate when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore Lutheran High School Association identifying Corporate Parent Baltimore Lutheran High School Association d/b/a Concordia Preparatory School for Baltimore Lutheran High School Association.(Driver, Lauren) Modified on 12/16/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Royer Driver on behalf of Baltimore Lutheran High School Association (Driver, Lauren)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Baltimore Lutheran High School Association.(Aist, James)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christina Graziano. Directing attorney Christina Graziano to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 11/23/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christina Graziano (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8978088.) by Donna Buettner-Hartsoe, N.H., a minor (Attachments: #1 Attachment Christina Graziano Pro Hac Vice Admissions)(Browne, Justin)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Baltimore Lutheran High School Association's answer due 12/4/2020. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/20/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Baltimore Lutheran High School Association (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Driver, Lauren)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Buettner-Hartsoe, N.H., a minor. Baltimore Lutheran High School Association served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified Mail Receipt & Tracking)(Browne, Justin)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore Lutheran High School Association.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore Lutheran High School Association d/b/a Concordia Preparatory School ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8934497.), filed by Donna Buettner-Hartsoe, N.H., a minor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Browne, Justin)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buettner-Hartsoe et al v. Baltimore Lutheran High School Association d/b/a Concordia Preparatory School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.H., a minor
Represented By: Justin Anthony Browne
Represented By: Christina Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Buettner-Hartsoe
Represented By: Justin Anthony Browne
Represented By: Christina Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Lutheran High School Association doing business as Concordia Preparatory School
Represented By: James Sunderland Aist
Represented By: Lauren Royer Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?