Peaker v. Aberdeen Auto Clean LLC et al
Plaintiff: DeAndre Peaker
Defendant: Samuel Ferraro and Aberdeen Auto Clean LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03147
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MARGINAL ORDER approving #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by DeAndre Peaker. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/24/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DeAndre Peaker (Wang, Devan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Samuel Ferraro.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Aberdeen Auto Clean LLC (krs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/30/2020 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aberdeen Auto Clean LLC, Samuel Ferraro ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637125399.), filed by DeAndre Peaker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit #1, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(krs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peaker v. Aberdeen Auto Clean LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAndre Peaker
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Represented By: Richard P Neuworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Ferraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aberdeen Auto Clean LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?