Granite Run Apartments Owner, LLC v. Wright
Plaintiff: Granite Run Apartments Owner, LLC
Defendant: Chandra Lynn Wright
Case Number: 1:2020cv03638
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 6/16/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 2/9/2021. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2021 Filing 18 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Gillcrist, Walter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 17 QC NOTICE: 16 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Chandra Lynn Wright was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. This case is not a part of the Magistrate Pilot Program and therefore this event should not have been used. Refile using the event "Magistrate Judge - consent to." It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM to Counsel Concerning Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/15/2021. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER regarding all proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/15/2021. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Goddard, Terry)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #11 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/15/2021. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for all Proceedings and Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for Settlement. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/15/2021. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARGINAL ORDER approving #9 Status Report filed by Chandra Lynn Wright. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/14/2021. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT Joint by Chandra Lynn Wright(Gillcrist, Walter)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/24/2021. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Scheduling Order, #2 Standing Order on Discovery Procedures)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chandra Lynn Wright.(Gillcrist, Walter)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Granite Run Apartments Owner, LLC. Chandra Lynn Wright served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021.(Goddard, Terry)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Granite Run Apartments Owner, LLC (Goddard, Terry)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Benjamin D Wharton. Directing attorney Benjamin D Wharton to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/22/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Chandra Lynn Wright.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2020 Deficiency Notice to Granite Run Apartments Owner, LLC. Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/28/2020 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin D. Wharton (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9017780.) by Granite Run Apartments Owner, LLC(Goddard, Terry)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chandra Lynn Wright ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9017749.), filed by Granite Run Apartments Owner, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Goddard, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granite Run Apartments Owner, LLC v. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Run Apartments Owner, LLC
Represented By: Terry L Goddard, Jr
Represented By: James D Skeen
Represented By: Benjamin D Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandra Lynn Wright
Represented By: Walter E Gillcrist, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?