Kaur v. Pollack et al
Plaintiff: Simarjeet Kaur
Defendant: American Freight Outlet Stores LLC agent of d/b/a Sears, ESL Investments, Inc., PRA Law Firm, PLLC, Seritage Growth Properties, Transform SR Holdings LLC agent of d/b/a Sears, Barry Rigby, Seritage SRC Finance LLC, ESL Investment Management, LP, ESL Investmen Management (GP) LLC, Jeffrey Markowski, Seritage KMT Finance, LLC, Palmer Recovery Attorneys, PLLC, Transform SR LLC agent of d/b/a Sears, Transform Holdco agent of d/b/a Sears, Sears Holdings Corporation agent of d/b/a/ Sears, Transform SR Operations LLC agent of d/b/a Sears, Sears, Roebuck & Co. agent of d/b/a Sears, Baltimore County Police Department, Officer Pollack, Seritage Growth Properties, L.P., Officer Birkmaier, Sears Outlet Stores LLC agent of d/b/a Sears, Sears Operations LLC agent of d/b/a Sears, Transform Operating Stores LLC agent of d/b/a Sears and Transform SR Brands, LLC agent of d/b/a Sears
Case Number: 1:2021cv00292
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/19/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sears, Roebuck & Co. by Simarjeet Kaur(Ledyard, David)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #15 Notice of Partial Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/11/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Simarjeet Kaur (Ledyard, David)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Baltimore County Defendants ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,,, by Baltimore County Police Department, Officer Birkmaier, Officer Pollack.(Watts, Jordan)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sears, Roebuck & Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pivor, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 14637126805 (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Baltimore County Police Department, Officer Birkmaier, Officer Pollack re #11 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Watts, Jordan)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/4/2021. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by Baltimore County Police Department, Officer Birkmaier, Officer Pollack (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simarjeet Kaur. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to American Freight Outlet Stores LLC, Baltimore County Police Department, Officer Birkmaier, ESL Investmen Management (GP) LLC, ESL Investment Management, LP, ESL Investments, Inc., Jeffrey Markowski, PRA Law Firm, PLLC, Palmer Recovery Attorneys, PLLC, Officer Pollack, Barry Rigby, Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Operations LLC, Sears Outlet Stores LLC, Sears, Roebuck & Co., Seritage Growth Properties, Seritage Growth Properties, L.P., Seritage KMT Finance, LLC, Seritage SRC Finance LLC, Transform Holdco, Transform Operating Stores LLC, Transform SR Brands, LLC, Transform SR Holdings LLC, Transform SR LLC, Transform SR Operations LLC.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Freight Outlet Stores LLC, Baltimore County Police Department, Officer Birkmaier, ESL Investmen Management (GP) LLC, ESL Investment Management, LP, ESL Investments, Inc., Jeffrey Markowski, PRA Law Firm, PLLC, Palmer Recovery Attorneys, PLLC, Officer Pollack, Barry Rigby, Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Operations LLC, Sears Outlet Stores LLC, Sears, Roebuck & Co., Seritage Growth Properties, Seritage Growth Properties, L.P., Seritage KMT Finance, LLC, Seritage SRC Finance LLC, Transform Holdco, Transform Operating Stores LLC, Transform SR Brands, LLC, Transform SR Holdings LLC, Transform SR LLC, Transform SR Operations LLC, filed by Simarjeet Kaur. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against American Freight Outlet Stores LLC, Baltimore County Police Department, Officer Birkmaier, ESL Investmen Management (GP) LLC, ESL Investment Management, LP, ESL Investments, Inc., Jeffrey Markowski, PRA Law Firm, PLLC, Palmer Recovery Attorneys, PLLC, Officer Pollack, Barry Rigby, Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Operations LLC, Sears Outlet Stores LLC, Sears, Roebuck & Co., Seritage Growth Properties, Seritage Growth Properties, L.P., Seritage KMT Finance, LLC, Seritage SRC Finance LLC, Transform Holdco, Transform Operating Stores LLC, Transform SR Brands, LLC, Transform SR Holdings LLC, Transform SR LLC, Transform SR Operations LLC, filed by Simarjeet Kaur. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Local Rule 103.5(a) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Watts, Jordan)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Officer Pollack (Watts, Jordan)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Officer Birkmaier (Watts, Jordan)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore County Police Department (Watts, Jordan)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-20-004268., filed by Officer Pollack, Baltimore County Police Department, Officer Birkmaier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Cert. of True Copy, #2 Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Service Seritage Growth Properties, #3 Exhibit 3- Affidavit of Service Balto. Co. PD, #4 Exhibit 4- Affidavit of Service Officer Birkmaier, #5 Exhibit 5- Affidavit of Service Sears Holdings, #6 Exhibit 6- Affidavit of Service Sears Operations LLC, #7 Exhibit 7- Affidavit of Service Sears Outlet Stores LLC, #8 Exhibit 8- Entry of Appearance Jordan Watts, Jr., #9 Exhibit 9- Entry of Appearance Veronica Love, #10 Exhibit 10- Case Info. Report, #11 Exhibit 11- MDEC Deficiency Notice, #12 Exhibit 12- Complaint, #13 Exhibit 13- Complaint, #14 Exhibit 14- Case Info. Report, #15 Exhibit 15- Writ of Summons, #16 Exhibit 16- Writ of Summons, #17 Exhibit 17- Writ of Summons, #18 Exhibit 18 - Writ of Summons, #19 Exhibit 19 - Writ of Summons, #20 Exhibit 20 - Writ of Summons, #21 Exhibit 21 - Writ of Summons, #22 Exhibit 22 - Writ of Summons, #23 Exhibit 23 - Writ of Summons, #24 Exhibit 24 - Writ of Summons, #25 Exhibit 25 - Writ of Summons, #26 Exhibit 26 - Writ of Summons, #27 Exhibit 27 - Writ of Summons, #28 Exhibit 28 - Writ of Summons, #29 Exhibit 29 - Writ of Summons, #30 Exhibit 30 - Writ of Summons, #31 Exhibit 31 - Writ of Summons, #32 Exhibit 32 - Writ of Summons, #33 Exhibit 33 - Writ of Summons, #34 Exhibit 34 - Writ of Summons, #35 Exhibit 35 - Writ of Summons, #36 Exhibit 36 - Writ of Summons, #37 Exhibit 37 - Writ of Summons, #38 Exhibit 38 - Writ of Summons, #39 Exhibit 39 - Writ of Summons, #40 Exhibit 40 - USPS Tracking 46779, #41 Exhibit 41 - USPS Tracking 46793, #42 Exhibit 42 - USPS Tracking 99473, #43 Exhibit 43 - USPS Tracking 80509, #44 Exhibit 44 - USPS Tracking 99503, #45 Exhibit 45 - USPS Tracking 46786, #46 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #47 Exhibit B - Cir. Ct. Notice of Removal)(Watts, Jordan)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (6-10) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaur v. Pollack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simarjeet Kaur
Represented By: David Charles Marks Ledyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Freight Outlet Stores LLC agent of d/b/a Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESL Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRA Law Firm, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seritage Growth Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transform SR Holdings LLC agent of d/b/a Sears
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seritage SRC Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESL Investment Management, LP
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESL Investmen Management (GP) LLC
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Markowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seritage KMT Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmer Recovery Attorneys, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transform SR LLC agent of d/b/a Sears
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transform Holdco agent of d/b/a Sears
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holdings Corporation agent of d/b/a/ Sears
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transform SR Operations LLC agent of d/b/a Sears
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck & Co. agent of d/b/a Sears
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Police Department
Represented By: Jordan V Watts, Jr
Represented By: Veronica Natasha Love, Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Pollack
Represented By: Jordan V Watts, Jr
Represented By: Veronica Natasha Love, Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seritage Growth Properties, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Birkmaier
Represented By: Jordan V Watts, Jr
Represented By: Veronica Natasha Love, Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Outlet Stores LLC agent of d/b/a Sears
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Operations LLC agent of d/b/a Sears
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transform Operating Stores LLC agent of d/b/a Sears
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transform SR Brands, LLC agent of d/b/a Sears
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Pivor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?