Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America et al v. Franchot
Plaintiff: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Internet Association, NetChoice and Computer & Communications Industry Association
Defendant: Peter Franchot
Case Number: 1:2021cv00410
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #21 consent motion for extension of time and DIRECTING the parties to file a joint status report with a proposed schedule on or before April 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/14/2021. (Chasanow, Deborah)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, and for Leave to File Joint Status Report by Peter Franchot. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Steven)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #19 consent motion for extension of time. Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' complaint is now due by April 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/5/2021. (Chasanow, Deborah)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Peter Franchot. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Steven)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Sullivan on behalf of Peter Franchot (Sullivan, Steven)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Internet Association, Computer & Communications Industry Association, NetChoice. Peter Franchot served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021.(Kimberly, Michael)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jennifer B Dickey. Directing attorney Jennifer B Dickey to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Tara Morrissey. Directing attorney Tara Morrissey to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sarah P Hogarth. Directing attorney Sarah P Hogarth to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen P. Kranz. Directing attorney Stephen P. Kranz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer B. Dickey (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9118122.) by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America(Kimberly, Michael)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tara S. Morrissey (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9118079.) by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America (Kimberly, Michael) Modified on 2/19/2021 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah P. Hogarth (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9118052.) by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Internet Association, NetChoice(Kimberly, Michael)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen P. Kranz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9118011.) by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Internet Association, NetChoice(Kimberly, Michael)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Computer & Communications Industry Association (Kimberly, Michael)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by NetChoice (Kimberly, Michael)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Internet Association (Kimberly, Michael)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America (Kimberly, Michael)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Whitfield Hughes on behalf of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Internet Association, NetChoice (Hughes, Paul)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Kimberly on behalf of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Internet Association, NetChoice (Kimberly, Michael)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Peter Franchot.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter Franchot, in his official capacity as Comptroller of the State of Maryland ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9117611.), filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Internet Association, Computer & Communications Industry Association, NetChoice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kimberly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America et al v. Franchot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Tara Morrissey
Represented By: Jennifer Dickey
Represented By: Sarah P Hogarth
Represented By: Stephen P. Kranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Association
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Sarah P Hogarth
Represented By: Stephen P. Kranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NetChoice
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Sarah P Hogarth
Represented By: Stephen P. Kranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Computer & Communications Industry Association
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Sarah P Hogarth
Represented By: Stephen P. Kranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Franchot
Represented By: Steven M Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?