Schkloven v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David J Schkloven
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00600
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/21/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/21/2021. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/23/2021. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Memorandum to Counsel)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 Correspondence re: Court's April 6, 2021 letter to counsel (Mullen, Kathleen)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM to Counsel. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/6/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against David J Schkloven by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Policy)(Mullen, Kathleen)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Mullen, Kathleen)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Mullen on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Mullen, Kathleen)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by David J Schkloven Civil Cover Sheet (Koch, James)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by David J Schkloven was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HARTFORDLIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY against David J Schkloven ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9149047.), filed by David J Schkloven. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Koch, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schkloven v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J Schkloven
Represented By: James P Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?