Watson v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Isaiah Watson
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00624
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #15 joint motion to modify the scheduling order. Discovery closes and a status report is due by March 15, 2022; the dispositive motions deadline is April 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/12/2021. (Chasanow, Deborah)
April 9, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld, Michael)
April 6, 2021 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Blumenfeld, Michael)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 [FILED IN ERROR] Supplemental to #3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Blumenfeld, Michael) Modified on 4/6/2021 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery closes and a status report is due by 8/9/2021; the dispositive motions deadline is 9/7/2021. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/26/2021. (sat, Chambers)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #8 unopposed partial motion to dismiss and DISMISSING Count II of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/26/2021. (Chasanow, Deborah)
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Isaiah Watson.(Brown, Brian)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to #5 Complaint as to Count I by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Request for Hearing)(Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 Correspondence re: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Statement in Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal (Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/12/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed by Isaiah Watson.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. was filed incorrectly. **All state court documents must be properly labeled and filed as separate attachments to the notice of removal (i.e. Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, Exhibit 2 - State Court Summons Issued. etc). Your filing has been accepted by court staff. No action is required on your part at this time. **All further filings in this case must be made in accordance with the policies and procedures of this Court on electronic filing. Those policies and procedures are available on the Court's website - www.mdd.uscourts.gov. (http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov.) (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-21-000249. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9154676), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Blumenfeld, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Evan Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Watson
Represented By: Brian S Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?