Kim et al v. Board of Education of Howard County
Plaintiff: William F. Holland and Lisa M.F. Kim
Defendant: Board of Education of Howard County
Case Number: 1:2021cv00655
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Certify Class filed by William F. Holland, Lisa M.F. Kim.(Smith, Michael)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William F. Holland, Lisa M.F. Kim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Board of Education of Howard County.(Backer, Jonathan)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Board of Education of Howard County (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - Michael Testimony, #4 Exhibit 2 - Spiegel MSJ Order, #5 Exhibit 3 - AG Letter 4.19.07)(Backer, Jonathan)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kaylan L Phillips. Directing attorney Kaylan L Phillips to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/6/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kaylan L. Phillips (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9202597.) by William F. Holland, Lisa M.F. Kim(Smith, Michael)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas Y Riley on behalf of Board of Education of Howard County (Riley, Nicolas)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #13 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' complaint is now due by April 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/29/2021. (Chasanow, Deborah)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Board of Education of Howard County(Backer, Jonathan)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nicolas Y Riley. Directing attorney Nicolas Y Riley to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 3/25/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicolas Y. Riley (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9181257.) by Board of Education of Howard County(Backer, Jonathan)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lev Backer on behalf of All Defendants (Backer, Jonathan)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa M.F. Kim, William F. Holland. Board of Education of Howard County waiver sent on 3/23/2021, answer due 5/24/2021.(Smith, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to Board of Education of Howard County.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Mark Blom, Esq. on 3/16/2021 by William F. Holland, Lisa M.F. Kim. Waiver of Service due by 5/17/2021.(Smith, Michael)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Certify Class by William F. Holland, Lisa M.F. Kim (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Maureen S. Riordan. Directing attorney Maureen S. Riordan to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of J Christian Adams. Directing attorney J Christian Adams to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Maureen S. Riordan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9162436.) by William F. Holland, Lisa M.F. Kim(Smith, Michael)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Christian Adams (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9162414.) by William F. Holland, Lisa M.F. Kim(Smith, Michael)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Other Relief against Board of Education of Howard County ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9162313.), filed by Lisa M.F. Kim, William F. Holland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim et al v. Board of Education of Howard County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Holland
Represented By: Maureen S. Riordan
Represented By: J Christian Adams
Represented By: Michael F Smith
Represented By: Kaylan L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M.F. Kim
Represented By: Maureen S. Riordan
Represented By: J Christian Adams
Represented By: Michael F Smith
Represented By: Kaylan L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Howard County
Represented By: Jonathan Lev Backer
Represented By: Nicolas Y Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?