Owens-El v. Chou et al
Plaintiff: James Joseph Owens-El
Defendant: Letta Reid-Tragdon, Maggie Chov, Kevin Randall, Paul O'Connor, State of Maryland, United States of America, Renata Stokes, Unknown Judge, Judith Tom Lin, Mack Abadudo, Mr. Heinz, Mr. Keith, Maggie Chou, John Doe No. 2, Councilman Eric Costello and John Doe No. One
Case Number: 1:2021cv00675
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Joseph Owens-El. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 Memorandum re #7 Order filed by James Joseph Owens-El. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 Proof of Service filed by James Joseph Owens-El re Defendant Mr. Heintz. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing Summons for Unknown Named District Judge, and Unknown Named White Male by Plaintiff James Joseph Owens-El. (Attachments: #1 USMS Forms)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing summons for Defendants Maggie Chou, Kevin Randall, Letta Reid-Tragdon, Renata Stokes, Paul O'Connor, Mack Abadudo, Judith Tomlin, Eric Costello, Mr. Keith, and Mr. Heinz by Plaintiff James Joseph Owens-El. (Attachments: # 1 USMS Forms) (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting plaintiff time to pay filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/5/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 5/5/21)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mack Abadudo, Maggie Chou, Eric Costello, John Doe No. 2, John Doe No. One, Judith Tom Lin, Mr. Heinz, Mr. Keith, Paul O'Connor, Kevin Randall, Letta Reid-Tragdon, State of Maryland, Renata Stokes, United States of America, Unknown Judge, filed by James Joseph Owens-El. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit (not labeled), #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-27, #5 Exhibit C-37, #6 Exhibit 1-C, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Summons for Chow, Randall, O'Connor, Costello and Unknown Judge ONLY, #17 USMS Forms for Chow, Randall, O'Connor, Costello ONLY, #18 Proof of Service of un-issued summons)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff time to file Amended Complaint and filing fee or motion for leave to proceed IFP as set forth. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/30/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m w/form 3/31/21)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/30/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 3/31/21)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by James Joseph Owens-El re #1 Complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 REDACTED COMPLAINT against Maggie Chou, Kevin Randall, Letta Reid-Tragdon, filed by James Joseph Owens-El. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/19/2021

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens-El v. Chou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Joseph Owens-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letta Reid-Tragdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Chov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renata Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Tom Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Abadudo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Heinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Councilman Eric Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?