Murphy v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robert Murphy
Defendant: Eaton Electrical, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., International Paper Company, Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc., Inc. Cooper Industries, Cutler-Hammer Inc., Subsidiary of the Eaton Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, CBS Corporation, S.B. Decking, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust, Foster Wheeler, LLC., Square D Company, Lofton Corporation, Eaton Corporation as Succesor to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., Viacom, Inc., Successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pensylvania Corp., Westinghouse Electric Corp., Wayne Manufacturing Corporation, Cutler-Hammer/Eaton Corp., Selby, Battersby & Company and Cooper Industries, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: MCIC, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Manville Trust Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Uniroyal, Inc., Phelps Packing and Rubber Co., A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Paramount Packing and Rubber, Inc. and John Crane Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00814
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #61 MOTION to Strike Third-Party Complaint of MCIC, Inc. filed by General Electric Company.(Haslup, Michael)
May 27, 2021 Filing 77 QC NOTICE: 76 Response in Support of Motion filed by General Electric Company was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file using the event under Responses and Replies > Reply to Response to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
May 26, 2021 Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion re #70 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Robert Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cantor, Andrew)
May 25, 2021 Filing 74 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cutler-Hammer/Eaton Corp., Eaton Electrical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc (Ireland) for Cutler-Hammer/Eaton Corp., Eaton Electrical, Inc..(Quigg, David)
May 25, 2021 Filing 73 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cooper Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc for Cooper Industries, Inc..(Quigg, David)
May 24, 2021 Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion re #61 MOTION to Strike Third-Party Complaint of MCIC, Inc. to General Electric filed by MCIC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grenzer, Louis)
May 24, 2021 Filing 71 Request for Hearing re #59 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Remand (Goldberg, Terri)
May 24, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Goldberg, Terri)
May 20, 2021 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 MOTION to Remand filed by Robert Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cantor, Andrew)
May 18, 2021 Filing 68 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BAYER AG, Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer for Bayer Cropscience, Inc..(Sheehan, Peter)
May 18, 2021 Filing 67 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company, Corporate Parent Dow Inc. for Union Carbide Corporation.(Sheehan, Peter)
May 12, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Woodward Sheehan on behalf of Bayer Cropscience, Inc. (Sheehan, Peter)
May 12, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Woodward Sheehan on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Sheehan, Peter)
May 12, 2021 Filing 64 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Phelps Packing and Rubber Co. (John, Edmund)
May 12, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund Kean John on behalf of Phelps Packing and Rubber Co. (John, Edmund)
May 11, 2021 Filing 62 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Haslup, Michael)
May 11, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION to Strike Third-Party Complaint of MCIC, Inc. by General Electric Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Haslup, Michael)
May 7, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Terri Lynn Goldberg on behalf of Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Goldberg, Terri)
May 7, 2021 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION to Remand filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit List)(Goldberg, Terri)
May 7, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Richard Waters on behalf of Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc. (Waters, Jason)
May 6, 2021 Filing 57 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Paramount Packing and Rubber, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Ins. Co. for Paramount Packing and Rubber, Inc..(Abenes, Laura)
May 6, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura D Abenes on behalf of Paramount Packing and Rubber, Inc. (Abenes, Laura)
May 4, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Quigg on behalf of Cutler-Hammer/Eaton Corp., Eaton Electrical, Inc. (Quigg, David)
May 4, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Quigg on behalf of Cooper Industries, Inc. (Quigg, David)
May 4, 2021 Filing 53 QC NOTICE: 51 Notice of Appearance filed by Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Each attorney must file their Notice of Appearance using their CM/ECF login in order to be added as counsel to a case. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
May 3, 2021 Filing 52 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc. (Haussler, Helyna)
May 3, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Helyna M Haussler on behalf of Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc. (Haussler, Helyna)
April 23, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION to Remand by Robert Murphy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order Requesting this Court remand this action to the Circuit Court for Baltimore City)(Richardson, Ronald)
April 9, 2021 Filing 48 Supplemental to #41 Response,, filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Request for Removal from Special Inactive Pretrial Docket - Robert Murphy, #2 Request for Removal From Special Inactive Pre-Trial Docket, #3 SB Decking, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint, #4 Short Form Answer of Defendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc., #5 Short Form Answer of The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust, #6 Short-Form Answer to Short-Form Complaint of MCIC, Inc., #7 Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust's ID of Cross and Third-Party Defendants, #8 Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust's Requests for Production of Documents, #9 Third Party Defendant Phelps Packing & Rubber Company, Inc.'s ID of Crossclaims, #10 3rd Party Defendant Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Cross-claims re Plaintiff Murphy, #11 Union Carbide Corporation's Answer to Cross-Claims, #12 Union Carbide Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #13 ViacomCBS Inc. Short Form Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint)(Goldberg, Terri)
April 9, 2021 Filing 47 Supplemental to #41 Response,, filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc.'s Answer to Cross, 3rd Party and 4th Party Complaints, #2 Phelps Packing & Rubber Co., Inc.'s Answer to Third Party Complaint, #3 Plaintiffs Affidavit of Return of Service for Defendants listed in Short Form Complaint, #4 Plaintiff's Expert Witness List, #5 Plaintiff's Fact Witness List and State-of-the-Art and or Corporate Fact Witness List, #6 Plaintiff's Request to Set the Case in for an Expedited Trial Schedule and Trial Date, #7 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order, #8 Proposed Order - Request for Removal, #9 Proposed Order Granting GE's Motion to Strike the 3rd Party Complaint of MCIC, Inc., #10 Proposed-Order - Plaintiff's Request to Set Case in for Expedited Trial Schedule and Trial Date)(Goldberg, Terri)
April 9, 2021 Filing 46 Supplemental to #41 Response,, filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 MCIC's Third Party Complaint, #2 Metropolitan Life Ins. Co.'s Answer to Complaint, #3 Metropolitan Life Ins. Co's Witness List, #4 Notice of Assignment, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal - Corrected Caption, #6 Notice of Filing Removal, #7 Notice of Service (Robert Murphy), #8 Lloyd E. Mitchell's NOS re Case Specific Interrogatories and Requests for Production, #9 Notice of Service, #10 Order Granted - Request for Removal From Inactive Pre-Trial Docket)(Goldberg, Terri)
April 9, 2021 Filing 45 Supplemental to #41 Response,, filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Ex A - GE's Motion to Strike MCIC 3rd Party Complaint, #2 Hopeman Brothers, Inc.'s ID of Cross Claims, #3 Schneider Electric's ID of Cross Claims, #4 International Paper Co.'s Short Form Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 John Crane's Answer to MCIC 3rd Party Complaint, #6 Letter Enclosing Plaintiff's Fact Witness List and Corporate Fact Witness List, #7 Lloyd E. Mitchell's Answer to Cross Claims of All Defendants, #8 Lloyd E. Mitchell's Cross Claims Against All Defendants and 3rd Party Defendants)(Goldberg, Terri)
April 9, 2021 Filing 44 Supplemental to #41 Response,, filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Cooper Industries, LLC's Answer, #2 Eaton Corporation's Answer, #3 Foster Wheeler, LLC's Answer, #4 Schneider Electric's Notice of Intention to Pursue Cross Claims, #5 Ex 1 - Notice of Filing of Removal, #6 Ex 1 - Plaintiff's Request for Expedited Trial Schedule, #7 General Electric's Motion to Strike MCIC 3rd Party Complaint, #8 Granted Proposed Order re Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Trial Schedule)(Goldberg, Terri)
April 9, 2021 Filing 43 Supplemental to #41 Response,, filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Bayer CropScience, Inc.'s Cross Claim, #2 Cross Claim of Union Carbide Corporation, #3 Cooper Industries Cross Claim, #4 Eaton Corporation's Cross Claim, #5 Foster Wheeler, LLC's Cross Claim)(Goldberg, Terri)
April 9, 2021 Filing 42 Supplemental to #41 Response,, filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 AW Chesterton's Answer to 3rd Party Complaint, #2 Bayer CropScience Answer to Cross Claims, #3 Bayer CropScience Answer to 3rd Party Complaint, #4 Complaint, Prayer for Jury Trial, #5 MCIC's Cross Claim for Indemnity and or Contribution, #6 John Crane, Inc.'s Cross Claim, #7 Cross Claim of SB Decking Against all Defendants, Cross and 3rd Party)(Goldberg, Terri)
April 9, 2021 Filing 41 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Filing of State Court Documents of Defendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc. filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Answer of Cooper Industries, Inc. to all Cross Claims and 3rd Party Complaints, #2 Answer of Eaton Corporation to all Cross Claims and 3rd Party Complaints, #3 Answer of Foster Wheeler to all Cross Claims and 3rd Party Complaints, #4 Answer of Schneider Electric to Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Answer of Lloyd E. Mitchell to Plaintiffs' Complant, #6 Answer of MCIC to all Cross Claims and 3rd Party Claims, #7 Answer of Schneider Electric to all Cross Claims and 3rd Party Complaints)(Goldberg, Terri)
April 9, 2021 Filing 40 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. Statement Per Standing Order of Defendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Goldberg, Terri)
April 8, 2021 Filing 39 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MCIC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford, Corporate Parent The Travelers, Corporate Parent Arrowood Indemnity Company f/k/a Royal Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Continental Insurance Company for MCIC, Inc..(Grenzer, Louis)
April 7, 2021 Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sampada Kapoor. Directing attorney Sampada Kapoor to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2021 Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alison O McMinn. Directing attorney Alison O McMinn to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2021 Filing 36 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust identifying Corporate Parent New Hampshire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz S.P.A., as successor to Riunione Adriatica di Sicurta, Corporate Parent St. Paul Fire and Marine Company, Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Insurance Company, a CNA Company, Corporate Parent The Granite State Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Insurance Company (f/k/a The Aetna Casualty and Surety Co.), Corporate Parent The Hartford Insurance Company for Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust.(Roberts, Theodore)
April 7, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sampada Kapoor (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9207680.) by International Paper Company(Maisano, Clare)
April 7, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alison O. McMinn (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9207655.) by International Paper Company(Maisano, Clare)
April 7, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Kane on behalf of Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust (Kane, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2021 Filing 32 QC NOTICE: 28 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust was filed incorrectly. **Anyone listed as having a financial interested in the litigation must be added. When prompted please add Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE by International Paper Company re #6 Notice (Other) Of Joinder in the Notice of Original Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Kulinski, Philip)
April 7, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Mason Richmond on behalf of Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust (Richmond, Scott)
April 7, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A Zemil on behalf of Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust (Zemil, Brian)
April 7, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore F Roberts on behalf of Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust (Roberts, Theodore)
April 7, 2021 Filing 26 QC NOTICE: 25 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by MCIC, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Anyone listed as having a financial interested in the lititgation must be added. When prompted please add Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2021 Filing 24 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by John Crane Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Smiths Group plc for John Crane Inc..(Hurley, Timothy)
April 7, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy McDevitt Hurley on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Hurley, Timothy)
April 6, 2021 Filing 22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by International Paper Company identifying Other Affiliate Interstate Fire & Casualty, ISLIC & International (TRG), Other Affiliate Northbrook/Allstate Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Associated Indemnity (Firemans Fund), Other Affiliate The Central National Group for International Paper Company.(Maisano, Clare)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/6/2021. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2021 Filing 20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements Inc. for CBS Corporation.(Kulinski, Philip)
April 6, 2021 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Goldberg, Terri)
April 6, 2021 Deficiency Notice for CBS Corporation AND Hopeman Brothers, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/13/2021 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2021 Deficiency Notice for MCIC, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/13/2021 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis E Grenzer, Jr on behalf of MCIC, Inc. (Grenzer, Louis)
April 1, 2021 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by S.B. Decking, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Quaker Chemical Corporation, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Other Affiliate Nationwide Indemnity Company for S.B. Decking, Inc..(Loker, F)
April 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by F Ford Loker, Jr on behalf of S.B. Decking, Inc. (Loker, F)
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Danielle Gile on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Gile, Dawn)
April 1, 2021 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric, SE, Other Affiliate American Employers, Other Affiliate Affiliated FM, Other Affiliate Allstate, Other Affiliate London Market Companies, Other Affiliate Lloyds' Underwriters for Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(MacDonald, Neil)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Joseph MacDonald on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (MacDonald, Neil)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/31/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. of Joinder in Notice of Original Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Brisker, Malcolm)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by CBS Corporation of Original Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Kulinski, Philip)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Maisano on behalf of CBS Corporation, International Paper Company (Maisano, Clare)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A Kulinski on behalf of CBS Corporation, International Paper Company (Kulinski, Philip)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Notice (Other) Amended Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal (Brisker, Malcolm)
March 31, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 MASTER COMPLAINT INTRODUCTION against Robert Murphy, filed by Robert Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of filing of state court discovery material (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Deposition, #2 Lang Deposition)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued 60 days as to Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against CBS Corporation, Cooper Industries, Inc., Cutler-Hammer/Eaton Corp., Eaton Electrical, Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., International Paper Company, Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc., Lofton Corporation, MCIC, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., S.B. Decking, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust, Wayne Manufacturing Corporation, filed by Robert Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Lower Complaint, #2 Lower Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 The above documents Nos. #7 through #10 are copies of filings in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibit 2 (Brisker, Malcolm)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24X20000038. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9192215), filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - ATIs, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Pltf Depo, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Lang Depo, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Master Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Subpart 2.75, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Subpart 164, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Johnson, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Equip List, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Spec 545)(Brisker, Malcolm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Murphy
Represented By: Ronald Eugene Richardson
Represented By: Andrew M Cantor
Represented By: Peter G Angelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Electrical, Inc.
Represented By: David J Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Dawn Danielle Gile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Alison O McMinn
Represented By: Sampada Kapoor
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc.
Represented By: Helyna M Haussler
Represented By: Jason Richard Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc. Cooper Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutler-Hammer Inc., Subsidiary of the Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Peter Woodward Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.B. Decking, Inc.
Represented By: F Ford Loker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Kane
Represented By: Brian A Zemil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Dawn Danielle Gile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lofton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation as Succesor to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.
Represented By: David J Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc., Successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pensylvania Corp.
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Manufacturing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutler-Hammer/Eaton Corp.
Represented By: David J Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selby, Battersby & Company
Represented By: F Ford Loker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David J Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MCIC, Inc.
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Trust Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Woodward Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Phelps Packing and Rubber Co.
Represented By: Edmund Kean John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Michael L Haslup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Paramount Packing and Rubber, Inc.
Represented By: Laura D Abenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Timothy McDevitt Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?