IBW Air Services, LLC et al v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: IBW Air Services, LLC and Grandview Aviation, LLC
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv01121
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Irene Angelica Firippis on behalf of The United States of America (Firippis, Irene)
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Guice Slawson, III on behalf of The United States of America (Slawson, Guice)
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J Pascale on behalf of IBW Air Services, LLC (Pascale, Kevin)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR - Counsel will refile) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Burton, Meighan) Modified on 5/24/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Phillips on behalf of The United States of America (Phillips, Kimberly)
May 21, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued 60 days as to The United States of America.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by IBW Air Services, LLC re #1 Complaint (Burton, Meighan)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 5/10/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Grandview Aviation, LLC, IBW Air Services, LLC or counsel for Grandview Aviation, LLC, IBW Air Services, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/24/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons for the U.S. Agency. To correct this problem, file Summons for the U.S. Agency using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons for the U.S. Agency to #1 Complaint. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9265485.), filed by IBW Air Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Burton, Meighan)
May 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IBW Air Services, LLC et al v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBW Air Services, LLC
Represented By: Meighan Griffin Burton
Represented By: Kevin J Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grandview Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Meighan Griffin Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Guice Slawson, III
Represented By: Irene Angelica Firippis
Represented By: Kimberly Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?