LaGrange v. Watson et al
Plaintiff: Barbara C. LaGrange
Defendant: W.K.F. Trucking, LLC, Wakefern Food Corp. and Carloo Everton Watson
Case Number: 1:2021cv01267
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wakefern Food Corp. identifying Other Affiliate PRRC, Inc., Other Affiliate ShopRite of Glen Burnie, LLC, Other Affiliate Food Haulers, Inc., Other Affiliate Gemini Acquisition Corp., Other Affiliate Industrial Highway Urban Renewal Corp., Other Affiliate SRS Envoy Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Readington Farms, Inc., Other Affiliate Gemini Food Markets, L.P., Other Affiliate Enfield Markets LLC, Other Affiliate National Transport Sevices Co., Inc., Other Affiliate ShopRite Beverages, Inc., Other Affiliate Shop-Rite Supermarkerts Inc. for Wakefern Food Corp..(Krause, R)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wakefern Food Corp..(Krause, R)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barbara C. LaGrange. W.K.F. Trucking, LLC waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021.(Weiss, Irwin)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barbara C. LaGrange. Carloo Everton Watson waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021.(Weiss, Irwin)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barbara C. LaGrange. Wakefern Food Corp. waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021.(Weiss, Irwin)
May 28, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to W.K.F. Trucking, LLC, Wakefern Food Corp., Carloo Everton Watson.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W.K.F. Trucking, LLC, Wakefern Food Corp., Carloo Everton Watson ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9291318.), filed by Barbara C. LaGrange. (Attachments: #1 Prayer for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Weiss, Irwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaGrange v. Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara C. LaGrange
Represented By: Irwin Everett Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.K.F. Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefern Food Corp.
Represented By: R Scott Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carloo Everton Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?