Just Puppies, Inc. et al v. Frosh
Plaintiff: Just Puppies, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Towson, Tara Baker, Sobrad, LLC d/b/a Pinnacle Pet, Charm City Puppies, LLC d/b/a Charm City Puppies & Boutique, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Rockville, Just Puppies, Inc. doing business as Just Puppies Towson, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Just Puppies Rockville, Charm City Puppies, LLC doing business as Charm City Puppies & Boutique, Sobrad, LLC doing business as Pinnacle Pet and Tara Baker doing business as Valley View Kennel
Defendant: Brian E. Frosh
Amicus Curiae: The Humane Society of the United States
Case Number: 1:2021cv01281
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 7 U.S.C. ยง 2131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER confirming the substance of discussions during the emergency telephone conference held on 7/20/21. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/20/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2021: #1 Order) (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Telephone Status Conference held on 7/20/2021 before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction filed by Brian E. Frosh.(Dietrich, Ryan)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Tara Baker, Charm City Puppies, LLC, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, Proposed Order (Borgerson, Meagan)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Tara Baker, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Sobrad, LLC, Charm City Puppies, LLC, Just Puppies, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #14 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tara Baker, Charm City Puppies, LLC, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Borgerson, Meagan)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Memorandum of Law of the Humane Society of the United States, as Amicus Curiae, in Support of #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Humane Society of the United States' Consent Motion for Leave to File a memorandum of law supporting Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/21/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Humane Society of the United States identifying Other Affiliate The Fund For Animals, Inc., Other Affiliate Humane Society International, Other Affiliate Humane Society Veterinary Medical Association, Inc., Other Affiliate Doris Day Animal League, Other Affiliate Humane Society Legislative Fund, Other Affiliate Friends of Humane Society International for the Protection and Conservation of Animals, Other Affiliate Humane Society International-United Kingdom, Other Affiliate Humane Society International Latin America, Other Affiliate Humane Society International-India, Other Affiliate Humane Society International-Canada, Other Affiliate Humane Society of the United States California Branch, Other Affiliate Humane Society of the United States New Jersey Branch, Other Affiliate The Humane Society Wildlife Land Trust, Other Affiliate Humane Society International-Europe, Other Affiliate Project Chimps, Other Affiliate Humane Society International Mexico, A.C., Other Affiliate Humane Society International-Africa, Other Affiliate The Humane Society Legislative Fund Policy Action Committee, Other Affiliate Humane Society International Korea for The Humane Society of the United States.(Henry, Ralph)
June 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum by The Humane Society of the United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Amicus Curiae Memorandum)(Henry, Ralph)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction by Brian E. Frosh (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Consolidated memorandum in support of motion to dismiss and opposition to plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Dietrich, Ryan)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/16/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brian E. Frosh (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dietrich, Ryan)
June 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Robert Dietrich on behalf of Brian E. Frosh (Dietrich, Ryan)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Tara Baker, Charm City Puppies, LLC, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Attachment)(Kagan, Jonathan)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tara Baker, Charm City Puppies, LLC, Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Just Puppies, Inc., Sobrad, LLC (Borgerson, Meagan)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Confirming the substance of the discussions during the Telephone Conference held on May 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/21/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Brian E. Frosh.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Deficiency Notice to Just Puppies, Inc., Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Charm City Puppies, LLC, Sobrad, LLC, Tara Baker. Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 6/1/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9293444.), filed by Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc., Charm City Puppies, LLC, Tara Baker, Sobrad, LLC, Just Puppies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Borgerson, Meagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Just Puppies, Inc. et al v. Frosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Puppies, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Towson
Represented By: Heather Kirkwood Yeung
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Baker
Represented By: Heather Kirkwood Yeung
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sobrad, LLC d/b/a Pinnacle Pet
Represented By: Heather Kirkwood Yeung
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charm City Puppies, LLC d/b/a Charm City Puppies & Boutique
Represented By: Heather Kirkwood Yeung
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Just Puppies Rockville
Represented By: Heather Kirkwood Yeung
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Puppies, Inc. doing business as Just Puppies Towson
Represented By: Heather Kirkwood Yeung
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Puppies of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Just Puppies Rockville
Represented By: Heather Kirkwood Yeung
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charm City Puppies, LLC doing business as Charm City Puppies & Boutique
Represented By: Heather Kirkwood Yeung
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sobrad, LLC doing business as Pinnacle Pet
Represented By: Heather Kirkwood Yeung
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Baker doing business as Valley View Kennel
Represented By: Heather Kirkwood Yeung
Represented By: Jonathan P Kagan
Represented By: Meagan Cooper Borgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Ryan Robert Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Ralph Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?