Silver et al v. Armstrong International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julia Beatrice Watson-Silver and Joseph Silver
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., Alfa Laval, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc,, SB Decking, Inc., Crane Co., Flowserve Corporation, General Electric Company, The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust, Eckel Industries, Inc., Metropolitan Life Ins. Co.,, The William Powell Company, ITT LLC, International Paper Company, Flowserve US, Inc., ViacomCBS, Inc., Lloyd E Mitchell Inc, The Nash Engineering Company, MCIC, Inc, IMO Industries, Inc., S.B. Decking, Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., Lloyd E. Mitchell, Incorporated, McCormick Asbestos Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance, Co., Selby, Battersby & Company, Demag Delaval Turbomachinery, Inc., CBS Corporation and Viacom, Inc. as successor to Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Cross Defendant: Siemens Demag Delaval Turbomachinery, Inc. and Armstrong International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01356
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 41 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by IMO Industries, Inc..(Newport, Joel)
July 30, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc..(Newport, Joel)
July 28, 2021 Filing 39 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance, Co. identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance, Co..(Twining, Jason)
July 27, 2021 Filing 38 (FILED IN ERROR - COUNSEL TO REFILE) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance, Co. (Twining, Jason) Modified on 7/28/2021 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
July 27, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M.A. Twining on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance, Co. (Twining, Jason)
July 27, 2021 Filing 36 Metropolitan Life Insurance Company ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance, Co..(Twining, Jason)
July 15, 2021 Filing 35 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The William Powell Company (Palmiotto, Vincent)
July 15, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The William Powell Company.(Palmiotto, Vincent)
July 12, 2021 Filing 33 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc for Foster Wheeler LLC.(Quigg, David)
July 8, 2021 Filing 32 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hopeman Brothers, Inc, (Goldberg, Terri)
July 8, 2021 Filing 31 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Co., Inc. for Gardner Denver, Inc..(Goldberg, Terri)
July 8, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm Sean Brisker on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc, (Brisker, Malcolm)
July 8, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Terri Lynn Goldberg on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc, (Goldberg, Terri)
July 8, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Maisano on behalf of International Paper Company (Maisano, Clare)
July 7, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Goldberg, Terri)
July 7, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Hopeman Brothers, Inc,.(Goldberg, Terri)
July 7, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Quigg, David)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Joseph Silver, Julia Beatrice Watson-Silver; Flowserve US, Inc. terminated. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/6/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Joseph Silver, Julia Beatrice Watson-Silver; Flowserve Corporation terminated. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/6/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Joseph Silver, Julia Beatrice Watson-Silver; Alfa Laval, Inc. terminated. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/6/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2021 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International, Inc. (Fitzpatrick, Brendan)
July 6, 2021 Filing 20 Armstrong International, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Armstrong International, Inc..(Fitzpatrick, Brendan)
July 2, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Silver, Julia Beatrice Watson-Silver (Kiely, Matthew)
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Silver, Julia Beatrice Watson-Silver (Kiely, Matthew)
July 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Silver, Julia Beatrice Watson-Silver (Kiely, Matthew)
July 2, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust.(Roberts, Theodore)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust identifying Corporate Parent New Hampshire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz S.P.A., as successor to Riunione Adriatica di Sicurta, Corporate Parent St. Paul Fire and Marine Company, Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Insurance Company, a CNA Company, Corporate Parent The Granite State Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Insurance Company (f/k/a The Aetna Casualty and Surety Co.), Corporate Parent The Hartford Insurance Company for The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust.(Roberts, Theodore)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Mason Richmond on behalf of The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust (Richmond, Scott)
July 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore F Roberts on behalf of The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust (Roberts, Theodore)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ITT LLC identifying Other Affiliate ITT Corporation, Other Affiliate ITT Industries, Inc. for ITT LLC.(Janssen, Amy)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ITT LLC.(Janssen, Amy)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by International Paper Company identifying Other Affiliate Interstate Fire & Casualty, ISLIC & International (TRG), Other Affiliate Northbrook/Allstate Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Associated Indemnity (Firemans Fund), Other Affiliate The Central National Group for International Paper Company.(Maisano, Clare)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ViacomCBS Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc..(Kulinski, Philip)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. identifying Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company Of North America, Other Affiliate Transamerica Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna, Other Affiliate Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Westlock Controls Corporation, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Ina, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Crane GmbH, Other Affiliate Crane International Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Aerospace, Inc., Other Affiliate ELDEC Corporation, Other Affiliate ELDEC France S.A.R.L., Other Affiliate Hydro-Aire, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane (Asia Pacific) Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Controls, Inc., Other Affiliate Barksdale, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Resistoflex GmbH, Other Affiliate CR Holdings C.V., Other Affiliate Crane Australia Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate P.T. Crane Indonesia, Other Affiliate Crane Holdings (Germany) GmbH, Other Affiliate Crane Process Flow Technologies GmbH, Other Affiliate Crane Process Flow Technologies S.P.R.L., Other Affiliate Xomox Hungary Kft., Other Affiliate Xomox Japan Ltd., Other Affiliate Xomox Korea Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane International Capital S.a.r.l., Other Affiliate Crane Canada Co., Other Affiliate Crane Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Merchandising Systems Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Process Flow Technologies Ltd., Other Affiliate ELDEC Electronics Ltd., Other Affiliate Interpoint S.A.R.L., Other Affiliate Crane Composites, Inc., Other Affiliate MCC Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Environmental Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Nuclear, Inc., Other Affiliate Xomox Corporation, Other Affiliate Xomox Sanmar Ltd., Other Affiliate Xomox Chihuahua S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Xomox Corporation de Venezuela C.A., Other Affiliate Crane Process Flow Technologies S.r.l., Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate Hartford, Other Affiliate Continental, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate The Employers Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty, Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ARDAC Inc., Other Affiliate Armature d.o.o., Other Affiliate Automatic Products (UK) Ltd., Other Affiliate B. Rhodes & Son Ltd., Other Affiliate Barksdale GmbH, Other Affiliate CA-MC Acquisition UK Ltd., Other Affiliate Coin Controls International Ltd., Other Affiliate Coin Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Coin Industries Ltd., Other Affiliate Coin Overseas Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Coin Pension Trustees Ltd., Other Affiliate Conlux Matsumoto Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Composites Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Electronics Corporation, Other Affiliate Crane Electronics, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane European Financing LLC, Other Affiliate Crane Fengqiu Zhejiang Pump Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Fluid & Gas Systems (Suzhou) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Global Holdings S.L., Other Affiliate Crane International Trading (Beijing) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Merger Co. LLC, Other Affiliate Crane Middle East & Africa FZE, Other Affiliate Crane Ningjin Valve Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane North America Funding LLC, Other Affiliate Crane Overseas, LLC, Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane Pension Trustee Company (UK) Limited, Other Affiliate Crane Process Flow Technologies (India) Pvt. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Pumps and Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Crane SC Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Stockham Valve. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Yongxiang (Ningbo) Valve Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Croning Livarna d.o.o., Other Affiliate Delta Fluid Products Ltd., Other Affiliate Donald Brown (Brownall) Ltd., Other Affiliate Flow Technology Inc., Other Affiliate Friedrich Krombach GmbH Armaturenwerke, Other Affiliate Hattersly Newman Hender Ltd., Other Affiliate Inta-Lok Ltd., Other Affiliate Interpoint U.K. Limited, Other Affiliate MEI Australia LLC, Other Affiliate MEI Auto Payment System (Shanghai) Ltd., Other Affiliate MEI Conlux Holdings (Japan), Inc., Other Affiliate MEI Conlux Holdings (US), Inc., Other Affiliate MEI de Mexico LLC, Other Affiliate MEI Payment Systems Hong Kong Ltd., Other Affiliate MEI Queretaro S. de R.L. de CV, Other Affiliate Merrimac Industries, Inc., Other Affiliate Mondais Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Money Controls Argentina SA, Other Affiliate Money Controls Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Multi-Mix Microtechnology SRL, Other Affiliate NABIC Valve Safety Products Ltd., Other Affiliate Nippon Conlux Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Noble Composites, Inc., Other Affiliate Pegler Hattersly Ltd., Other Affiliate Sperryn & Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Terminal Manufacturing Co., Other Affiliate Triangle Valve Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Unidynamics / Phoenix, Inc., Other Affiliate Viking Johnson Ltd., Other Affiliate W.T. Armatur GmbH, Other Affiliate Wade Couplings Ltd., Other Affiliate Wask Ltd., Other Affiliate Xomox France S.A.S., Other Affiliate Xomox International GmbH & Co. OHG, Other Affiliate Xomox Southeast Asia Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Ireland Ventures Designated Activity Company, Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations GmbH, Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations International Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations Pty Ltd., Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations Sarl, Other Affiliate Crane Payment Innovations Srl, Other Affiliate Crane Valves India Pvt. Ltd., Other Affiliate Microtonic AG, Other Affiliate Pandora Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Yilme Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate CPI-Kiev LLC, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company for Crane Co..(MacDonald, Neil)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by International Paper Company.(Kulinski, Philip)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ViacomCBS Inc..(Kulinski, Philip)
June 23, 2021 Deficiency Notice to Crane Co. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 6/30/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Danielle Gile on behalf of Crane Co. (Gile, Dawn)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Joseph MacDonald on behalf of Crane Co. (MacDonald, Neil)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crane Co..(MacDonald, Neil)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Alfa Laval, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Crane Co., Eckel Industries, Inc., Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc,, IMO Industries, Inc., ITT LLC, International Paper Company, Lloyd E. Mitchell, Incorporated, MCIC, Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance, Co., S.B. Decking, Inc., Siemens Demag Delaval Turbomachinery, Inc., The Nash Engineering Company, The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust, The William Powell Company, ViacomCBS Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9305187.), filed by Joseph Silver, Julia Beatrice Watson-Silver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kiely, Matthew)
June 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. (kos, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver et al v. Armstrong International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: David J Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc,
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Dawn Danielle Gile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckel Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Ins. Co.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Vincent J Palmiotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Amy Janssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd E Mitchell Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCIC, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joel D Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.B. Decking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd E. Mitchell, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCormick Asbestos Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance, Co.
Represented By: Jason M.A. Twining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selby, Battersby & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demag Delaval Turbomachinery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc. as successor to Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Siemens Demag Delaval Turbomachinery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Henderson Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Beatrice Watson-Silver
Represented By: Matthew E Kiely
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Silver
Represented By: Matthew E Kiely
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?