Global Garlic, Inc. v. Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Global Garlic, Inc.
Defendant: Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC and Omar Cerna Rubinstein
Case Number: 1:2021cv01487
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Global Garlic, Inc. (Garcia-Zamor, Ruy)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Global Garlic, Inc.. Omar Cerna Rubinstein waiver sent on 6/22/2021, answer due 8/23/2021.(Garcia-Zamor, Ruy)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Global Garlic, Inc.. Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC waiver sent on 6/22/2021, answer due 8/23/2021.(Garcia-Zamor, Ruy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint, filed by Global Garlic, Inc., 7 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, (Garcia-Zamor, Ruy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #3 Notice (Other) filed by Global Garlic, Inc. was filed incorrectly. ****Please refile the AO 120 form using the correct event by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC, Omar Cerna Rubinstein.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christian Jay Sanchelima. Directing attorney Christian Jay Sanchelima to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christian Jay Sanchelima (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9333250.) by Global Garlic, Inc.(Garcia-Zamor, Ruy)
June 17, 2021 Deficiency Notice as to Global Garlic, Inc.-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 6/24/2021 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Global Garlic, Inc. re 2 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, #1 Complaint, Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Institutional Coordinator Letter Form for notifying fUSPTO of lawsuit involving trademarks)(Garcia-Zamor, Ruy)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Global Garlic, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2021 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 6/23/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9329988.), filed by Global Garlic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Trademark Registrations, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Product, #4 Exhibit Proof of sale., #5 Exhibit Proof of sale.)(Garcia-Zamor, Ruy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Garlic, Inc. v. Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Distribuidora Mi Honduras, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Cerna Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Garlic, Inc.
Represented By: Ruy McEwan Garcia-Zamor
Represented By: Christian Jay Sanchelima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?