Walsh v. Bicallis, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alejandro A Herrera and Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: Bicalls, LLC, Bicalls, LLC 401 K Plan, Bryan Hill, Bicallis, LLC and Bicallis, LLC 401(k) Plan
Case Number: 1:2021cv01746
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin J. Walsh. Bicallis, LLC served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021.(Herrera, Alejandro)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin J. Walsh. Bryan Hill served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021.(Herrera, Alejandro)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin J. Walsh. Bicallis, LLC 401(k) Plan served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021.(Herrera, Alejandro)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bicallis, LLC, Bicallis, LLC 401(k) Plan, Bryan Hill. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Martin J. Walsh Request for Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Bicallis, LLC, #2 Summons Bryan Hill, #3 Bicallis, LLC 401(k) Plan)(Herrera, Alejandro)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bryan Hill on 07/13/2021 by Martin J. Walsh. Waiver of Service due by 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver)(Herrera, Alejandro)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bicallis, LLC on 07/13/2021 by Martin J. Walsh. Waiver of Service due by 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver)(Herrera, Alejandro)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bicallis, LLC 401(k) Plan on 07/13/2021 by Martin J. Walsh. Waiver of Service due by 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver)(Herrera, Alejandro)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/14/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Martin J. Walsh or counsel for Martin J. Walsh are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/28/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Alejandro A Herrera FRCP 4(d) Waiver Request (Herrera, Alejandro)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bicalls, LLC, Bicalls, LLC 401 K Plan, Bryan Hill, filed by Alejandro A Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Herrera, Alejandro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Bicallis, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro A Herrera
Represented By: Alejandro Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Alejandro Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bicalls, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bicalls, LLC 401 K Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bicallis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bicallis, LLC 401(k) Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?