Family Health Physical Medicine, LLC v. Pulse8, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Family Health Physical Medicine, LLC
Defendant: Pulse8, Inc. and Pulse8, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02095
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pulse8, Inc., Pulse8, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate Allscripts Healthcare, LLC, Other Affiliate Allscripts Healthcare US, LP, Other Affiliate Allscripts Holdings 2, LLC, Other Affiliate Allscripts Holdings, LLC for Pulse8, Inc., Pulse8, LLC.(Lankford, Taylor)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/15/2021. (vals, Chambers)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Pulse8, Inc., Pulse8, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file and enter the name of all entities listed on your document when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, #4 Supplemental by Pulse8, Inc., Pulse8, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lankford, Taylor)
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pulse8, Inc., Pulse8, LLC (Lankford, Taylor) Modified on 9/15/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor T Lankford on behalf of All Defendants (Lankford, Taylor)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Family Health Physical Medicine, LLC. Pulse8, LLC served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021.(Kelly, Ryan)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Directing attorney to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan M. Kelly (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9446488.) by Family Health Physical Medicine, LLC(Ring, Stephen)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Family Health Physical Medicine, LLC (Ring, Stephen)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Family Health Physical Medicine, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ring, Stephen)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Family Health Physical Medicine, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Please file a corrected complaint pursuant to Local Rule 102.2.a re: a complaint caption shall contain the names and addresses of all parties and the county of residence. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Pulse8, Inc., Pulse8, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pulse8, Inc., Pulse8, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9441976.), filed by Family Health Physical Medicine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Ring, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Family Health Physical Medicine, LLC v. Pulse8, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Health Physical Medicine, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M Kelly
Represented By: Stephen Howard Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulse8, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor T Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulse8, LLC
Represented By: Taylor T Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?