Lacks v. Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.
Plaintiff: The Estate of Henrietta Lacks and Ron L. Lacks
Defendant: Thermo Fisher Scientific INC.
Petitioner: Dr. Kennan Cofield
Amicus Curiae: The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Health Law Program, The National Women's Law Center, Deleso A. Alford, J.D., LL.M., Doug Rendleman and Caprice Roberts
Case Number: 1:2021cv02524
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Filing 72 Motion Hearing held on 5/17/2022 re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. before Judge Deborah L. Boardman.(Court Reporter: Ronda Thomas) (jh2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE by Ron L. Lacks re #68 Response, 70 Order, #67 Response, #69 Response, #41 Response in Opposition to Motion Of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Parker, Kim)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PAPERLESS ORDER scheduling a motions hearing on #20 for Tuesday, May 17, 2022 at 10 a.m.. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/20/2022. (lmys, Chambers)
April 5, 2022 Filing 69 AMICUS BRIEF re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Deleso A. Alford, J.D., LL.M.. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2022 Filing 68 AMICUS BRIEF re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by National Health Law Program, The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, The National Women's Law Center. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2022 Filing 67 Amicus Brief re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Doug Rendleman, Caprice Roberts. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying #48 Rendleman and Roberts' Motion to Intervene; granting #49 Rendleman and Roberts' Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Amici Curiae; granting #51 the organizations' Consent Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief; granting #52 Alford's Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/5/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying #44 Cofield's Motion to Intervene; granting in part #56 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Strike Filings by Kennan Cofield and Impose Filing Restrictions; denying #57 Cofield's Motion to Strike Plaintiff(s) the Estate of Henrietta Lacks Motion to Strike Filings; denying #58 Cofield's Motion to Strike Intervenors Amici Doug Rendleman, Caprice Roberts, Deleso A. Alford, the Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Documents 48,49,51 and others for Violation of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 24(c), and Rule 5 for Failure to Serve the Motion to Intervene Upon all Parties, Jointly; denying #59 Cofield's Motion to Strike Complaint; directing that the Clerk shall reject and not docket any future documents submitted by Cofield unless they are filed on his behalf by an attorney admitted to this Court. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 3/29/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2022 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Strike filed by Deleso A. Alford, J.D., LL.M.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansel, Cary)
March 22, 2022 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected) filed by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit 1)(George, Andrew)
March 22, 2022 Filing 62 RESPONSE re #58 MOTION to Strike, #59 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, #61 Response, #57 MOTION to Strike (Corrected) filed by Ron L. Lacks.(Parker, Kim)
March 22, 2022 Filing 61 RESPONSE re #58 MOTION to Strike, #59 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, #57 MOTION to Strike filed by Ron L. Lacks.(Parker, Kim)
March 21, 2022 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 1)(George, Andrew)
March 15, 2022 Filing 59 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by Kennan Cofield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Envelope) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to Strike Intervenors Amici Doug Rendleman, Caprice Roberts, Deleso A. Alford, the Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Documents 48,49,51 and others for Violation of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 24(c), and Rule 5 for Failure to Serve the Motion to Intervene Upon all Parties, Jointly by Kennan Cofield (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff(s) the Estate of Henrietta Lacks Motion to Strike Filings by Kennan Cofield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2022 Filing 56 MOTION to Strike #43 Notice (Other), #50 Supplemental, #44 MOTION to Intervene, #55 Consent to Receive Electronic Notice, #53 Notice (Other) And to Impose Filing Restrictions, or In The Alternative Opposition to His (Kennan Cofield) Motion For Intervention by Ron L. Lacks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Kim)
February 28, 2022 Filing 55 -STRICKEN PER #65 - Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Kennan Cofield. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/29/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PAPERLESS ORDER approving the parties' stipulation that defendant shall file its reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss on or before March 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 2/23/2022. (lmys, Chambers)
February 22, 2022 Filing 53 -STRICKEN PER #65 - NOTICE Proposed Order by Kennan Cofield re #43 Notice (Other), #44 MOTION to Intervene, #50 Supplemental (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/29/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
February 22, 2022 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Deleso A. Alford, J.D., LL.M. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief of Amicus Curiae Deleso A. Alford, J.D., LL.M., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hansel, Cary)
February 22, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Health Law Program, The National Women's Law Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Spence, Dorian)
February 22, 2022 Filing 50 -STRICKEN PER #65 - Supplemental to #43 Notice (Other), #44 MOTION to Intervene filed by Kennan Cofield (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/29/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
February 18, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff by Andrew C White (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(White, Andrew)
February 18, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION to Intervene by Andrew C White (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(White, Andrew)
February 17, 2022 Filing 47 STIPULATION re #20 MOTION to Dismiss by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.(George, Andrew)
February 17, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Dec on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (Dec, Adam)
February 16, 2022 Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #39 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Yasmine G Meyer. Directing attorney Yasmine G Meyer to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. Signed by Clerk on 2/16/2022. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2022 Filing 42 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #38 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey S. Grand. Directing attorney Jeffrey S. Grand to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Clerk on 2/15/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION to Intervene by Kennan Cofield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Envelope) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2022 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ron L. Lacks. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Kim)
February 14, 2022 Filing 40 QC NOTICE: #37 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks, Ron L. Lacks was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #37 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2022 Filing 39 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yasmine G. Meyer by Ron L. Lacks. The fee has already been paid.(Parker, Kim)
February 14, 2022 Filing 38 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffery S. Grand by Ron L. Lacks. The fee has already been paid.(Parker, Kim)
February 14, 2022 Filing 37 -REFILED AT #41 - RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ron L. Lacks, The Estate of Henrietta Lacks.(Parker, Kim) Modified on 2/14/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
February 11, 2022 Filing 43 -STRICKEN PER #65 - NOTICE re: Who is Legally the Person Names Henrietta Lacks? Amicus Curiae Filing and Report by Kennan Cofield (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/15/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 3/29/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
January 26, 2022 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., filed by Ron L. Lacks. (Attachments: #1 Redlined Copy) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MARGINAL ORDER granting #33 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 1/26/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2022 Filing 34 -FILED IN ERROR- AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., filed by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline Amended Complaint)(Parker, Kim) Modified on 1/26/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
January 26, 2022 Filing 33 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, and Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Firs Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redline First Amended Complaint)(Parker, Kim)
January 7, 2022 Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #29 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher A Seeger, Nigel Halliday, Christopher L Ayers. Directing attorney Christopher A Seeger, Nigel Halliday, Christopher L Ayers to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration; granting #30 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher A Seeger, Nigel Halliday, Christopher L Ayers. Directing attorney Christopher A Seeger, Nigel Halliday, Christopher L Ayers to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration; granting #31 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher A Seeger, Nigel Halliday, Christopher L Ayers. Directing attorney Christopher A Seeger, Nigel Halliday, Christopher L Ayers to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/7/2022. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2022 Filing 31 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher L. Ayers by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks. The fee has already been paid.(Parker, Kim)
January 6, 2022 Filing 30 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nigel Halliday by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks. The fee has already been paid.(Parker, Kim)
January 6, 2022 Filing 29 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Seeger by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks. The fee has already been paid.(Parker, Kim)
January 5, 2022 Filing 28 QC NOTICE: #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks, #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks, #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks, #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks, #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yasmine G. Meyer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9682899.) by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks(Parker, Kim)
January 4, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nigel Halliday (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9682897.) by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks(Parker, Kim)
January 4, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffery S. Grand (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9682894.) by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks(Parker, Kim)
January 4, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher L. Ayers (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9682892.) by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks(Parker, Kim)
January 4, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Seeger (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9682891.) by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks(Parker, Kim)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #21 Stipulation filed by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/10/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #20 MOTION to Dismiss And Proposed Order For Extension Of Time To Respond To Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks(Parker, Kim)
December 16, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(George, Andrew)
December 16, 2021 Filing 19 QC NOTICE: #18 Motion to Dismiss filed by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. was filed incorrectly. **A motion and supporting memorandum must be filed separately. The motion should be filed as the main document and the supporting memorandum as a separate attachment to the main document. Exhibits should not be attached as one document. Each exhibit should be individually attached and labeled. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2021 Filing 18 -FILED IN ERROR- MOTION to Dismiss by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-18, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(George, Andrew) Modified on 12/16/2021 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
December 15, 2021 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Eileen F Hyde. Directing attorney Eileen F Hyde to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/15/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2021 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of JoAnna Adkisson. Directing attorney JoAnna Adkisson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/15/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eileen F. Hyde (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9657226.) by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.(Cronin, Tonya)
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for JoAnna Beth Adkisson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9657218.) by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.(Cronin, Tonya)
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadira Clarke on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (Clarke, Nadira)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T. George on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (George, Andrew)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (Cronin, Tonya)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARGINAL ORDER approving #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/4/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.(Cronin, Tonya)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tonya Kelly Cronin on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (Cronin, Tonya)
October 29, 2021 Deficiency Notice for Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 11/5/2021 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Benjamin L Crump. Directing attorney Benjamin L Crump to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 10/5/2021. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. The Estate of Henrietta Lacks or counsel for The Estate of Henrietta Lacks are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/19/2021. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin L. Crump (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9531446.) by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks(Parker, Kim)
October 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT And Jury Trial Prayer against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9527708.), filed by The Estate of Henrietta Lacks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc)(Parker, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacks v. Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Henrietta Lacks
Represented By: Kim D Parker, Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin L Crump
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Jeffrey S Grand
Represented By: Nigel Halliday
Represented By: Yasmine G Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron L. Lacks
Represented By: Benjamin L Crump
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Jeffrey S Grand
Represented By: Nigel Halliday
Represented By: Kim D Parker, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermo Fisher Scientific INC.
Represented By: Andrew T. George
Represented By: Tonya Kelly Cronin
Represented By: Nadira Clarke
Represented By: Adam Dec
Represented By: Eileen F Hyde
Represented By: JoAnna Adkisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dr. Kennan Cofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: Dorian Lawrence Spence, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Health Law Program
Represented By: Dorian Lawrence Spence, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The National Women's Law Center
Represented By: Dorian Lawrence Spence, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Deleso A. Alford, J.D., LL.M.
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Doug Rendleman
Represented By: Andrew C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Caprice Roberts
Represented By: Andrew C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?