Nichols v. Perdue AgriBusiness LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Nichols
Defendant: Perdue AgriBusiness LLC and James Mitchell
Case Number: 1:2021cv02803
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 jb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann Marie Nichols. James Mitchell served on 12/23/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Email)(Cockey, Robin)
December 23, 2021 Filing 22 Summons Issued 21 days as to James Mitchell. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2021 Filing 21 Jury Trial Demand by Ann Marie Nichols(Cockey, Robin)
December 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Ann Marie Nichols re #19 Amended Complaint Summons for Defendant Mitchell (Cockey, Robin)
December 23, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Perdue AgriBusiness LLC, James Mitchell, filed by Ann Marie Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Redlined Copy, #2 EEOC Notice of Right to Sue) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Consent Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The proposed amended complaint, ECF 51-1, is accepted as filed. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/23/2021. (lmys, Chambers)
December 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Ann Marie Nichols re #15 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Cockey, Robin)
December 22, 2021 Filing 16 QC NOTICE: #15 Motion for Leave to File filed by Ann Marie Nichols was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #15 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Ann Marie Nichols (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint - Clean, #2 First Amended Complaint - Redline, #3 Exhibit A)(Cockey, Robin)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 QC NOTICE: #12 Amended Complaint filed by Ann Marie Nichols needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Motion for leave to file amended complaint is required. Please file the motion for leave to file as the main document, and the clean version of the amended complaint and redline version as two separate attachments to the motion. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 Jury Trial Demand by Ann Marie Nichols(Cockey, Robin)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 -FILED IN ERROR- AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ann Marie Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Red-line copy, #3 Summons James Mitchell)(Cockey, Robin) Modified on 12/21/2021 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/10/2021. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/13/2022. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/10/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Correspondence re: scheduling (Cockey, Robin)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Informal Discovery Dispute Procedure. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/29/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER scheduling conference call. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Perdue AgriBusiness LLC identifying Corporate Parent Perdue Farms Inc. for Perdue AgriBusiness LLC.(Niccolini, Robert)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Perdue AgriBusiness LLC.(Niccolini, Robert)
November 24, 2021 Deficiency Notice for Perdue AgriBusiness LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/1/2021 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann Marie Nichols. Perdue AgriBusiness LLC served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(Cockey, Robin)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Perdue AgriBusiness LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Jury Trial Demand by Ann Marie Nichols(Cockey, Robin)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Perdue AgriBusiness LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9583527.), filed by Ann Marie Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Cockey, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Perdue AgriBusiness LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Nichols
Represented By: Ashley Ann Bosche
Represented By: Robin R Cockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue AgriBusiness LLC
Represented By: Robert Ross Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?