Francischetti v. Baltimore County OCS Support Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Steve Francischetti
Defendant: Baltimore County OCS Support Enforcement, Social Security Administration's Maryland Office and Office of Program Law Office of the General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2021cv02896
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE by Steve Francischetti Civil Cover Sheet & Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Summons Summons in a Civil Action)(Clasing, Kevin)
January 7, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Francischetti. (Clasing, Kevin)
January 5, 2022 Filing 17 QC NOTICE: #16 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by Steve Francischetti was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile affidavit under the "Service of Process" category, select the "Summons Returned Executed" event not as to USA, and enter the service date when requested. The affidavit has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2022 Filing 16 (FILED IN ERROR INCORRECT EVENT) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Francischetti. Baltimore County OCS Support Enforcement served on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022.(Clasing, Kevin) Modified on 1/5/2022 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
January 5, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Francischetti. Office of Program Law Office of the General Counsel served on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022.(Clasing, Kevin)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 QC NOTICE: #11 Affidavit of Service filed by Steve Francischetti was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile affidavit under the "Service of Process" category, select the "Summons Returned Executed" event, and enter the service date when requested. The affidavit has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #10 Affidavit of Service filed by Steve Francischetti and #12 Affidavit of Service filed by Steve Francischetti were filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile affidavits under the "Service of Process" category, select the "Summons Returned Executed as to USA" event, and enter the service date when requested. The affidavits have been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on Office of Program Law Office of the General Counsel on 12/7/21, filed by Steve Francischetti.(Clasing, Kevin) Modified on 12/21/2021 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on Michael E. Field County Attorney on 12/7/21, filed by Steve Francischetti.(Clasing, Kevin) Modified on 12/21/2021 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on Ererk L. Baron, Esquire, US Attorney on 12/6/2021, filed by Steve Francischetti.(Clasing, Kevin) Modified on 12/21/2021 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency Exparte by Steve Francischetti (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Emergency Exparte Temporary Restraining Order)(Clasing, Kevin)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 11/16/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued 60 days as to Office of Program Law Office of the General Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USAG, #2 USA) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore County OCS Support Enforcement. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Steve Francischetti Summons (Clasing, Kevin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT) COMPLAINT & Emergency Exparte Motion for Injunctive Release & Temporary Restraining Order against All Parties, filed by Steve Francischetti. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Receipt Summons)(Clasing, Kevin) Modified on 11/15/2021 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Steve Francischetti re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons)(Clasing, Kevin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Steve Francischetti was filed missing information. **Please file a civil cover sheet and summons for each defendant using the event Notice (Other) and link filing to #1 Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND EMERGENCY EXPARTE MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND TEMPORARY ORDER against All Parties ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9601559.), filed by Steve Francischetti. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Counsel, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Emergency Exparte Temporary Restraining Order)(Clasing, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francischetti v. Baltimore County OCS Support Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Francischetti
Represented By: Kevin Albert Clasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County OCS Support Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration's Maryland Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Program Law Office of the General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?