Parker v. Homesite Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jameela Parker
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv02906
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel W Ballard. Directing attorney Daniel W Ballard to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/6/2022. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura C. Walters, Esquire (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9684749.) by Jameela Parker(Walters, Laura)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/13/2022. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/4/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 PAPERLESS Correspondence to counsel: The conference call originally scheduled for December 14, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. has been rescheduled for Tuesday, January 4, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. (sj2s, Chambers)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 MISCELLANEOUS Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss the attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (sj2s, Chambers)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Homesite Insurance Company.(Barranco, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Homesite Insurance Company re #4 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal (Barranco, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Homesite Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jameela Parker
Represented By: Laura Campbell Walters
Represented By: Daniel W Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael S Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?