Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. Baltimore County, Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Common Cause Maryland, Charles Sydnor, Anthony Fugett, Dana Vickers Shelley, Danita Tolson, Sharon Blake, Gerald Morrison and Niesha McCoy
Defendant: Baltimore County, Maryland, Julian E. Jones, Jr., in his official capacity as Chairman of the Baltimore County Council, Tom Quirk, in his official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council, Izzy Patoka, in his official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council, Wade Kach, in his official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council, David Marks, in his official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council, Cathy Bevins, in her official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council, Todd K. Crandell, in his official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council, Baltimore County Board of Elections, Julian E. Jones, Tom Quirk, Izzy Patoka, Wade Kach, David Marks, Cathy Bevins and Todd K. Crandell
Case Number: 1:2021cv03232
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Supplemental to #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson (Freedman, John)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE by Baltimore County, Maryland of Filing Exhibit re: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Martinez, Melissa)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2022 re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Anthony Fugett, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Gerald Morrison, Common Cause Maryland, Dana Vickers Shelley, Danita Tolson, Niesha McCoy before Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby.(Court Reporter: Melissa Clark) (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Plaintiffs' RESPONSE to Defendant Baltimore County's Notice of #42 Supplemental Authority and #45 Untimely Declarations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/14/2022. (rs7s, Chambers)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File by Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson (Attachments: #1 Attachment PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT BALTIMORE COUNTY'S NOTICE OF "SUPPLEMENTAL" AUTHORITY (ECF 42) AND UNTIMELY DECLARATIONS (ECF 45), #2 Exhibit 1 - In re 2022 Legislative Districting COA Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Prince Georges County COA Order)(Freedman, John)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re: February 15, 2022 Hearing. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/14/2022. (rs7s, Chambers)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #44 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Mazzullo. Directing attorney Michael Mazzullo to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://www.PACER.gov.. Signed by Clerk on 2/11/2022. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE by Baltimore County, Maryland re #38 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Martinez, Melissa)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Mazzullo (Original Receipt Number: 0416-9703283) by Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson. The fee has already been paid.(Freedman, John)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE by Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson re #38 Order (Freedman, John)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE by Baltimore County, Maryland NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martinez, Melissa)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Second Barreto Declaration, #2 Exhibit F - Second Cooper Declaration, #3 Exhibit G - Pasteur Declaration, #4 Exhibit H - Sydnor Declaration, #5 Exhibit I - Hill Declaration)(Freedman, John)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 QC NOTICE: #39 Response in Support of Motion filed by League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Anthony Fugett, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Gerald Morrison, Common Cause Maryland, Dana Vickers Shelley, Danita Tolson, Niesha McCoy was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event selected. Please refile using the event under Responses and Replies > Reply to Response to Motion and link your document to the original motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 (FILED IN ERROR) RESPONSE in Support re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Second Declaration of Matthew A. Barreto, #2 Exhibit F - Second Declaration of William S. Cooper, #3 Exhibit G - Declaration of Cheryl Pasteur, #4 Exhibit H - Declaration of Charles E. Sydnor III, #5 Exhibit I - Declaration of Charles Matthew Hill)(Freedman, John) Modified on 2/8/2022 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re: February 15, 2022 Hearing. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/4/2022. (rs7s, Chambers)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER re #32 Stipulation filed by Baltimore County Board of Elections. Defendant Baltimore County Board of Elections shall answer, or otherwise respond to, the complaint, within 30 days from the date on which the Court issues a ruling on plaintiffs' pending motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/1/2022. (rs7s, Chambers)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren N Weaver on behalf of Baltimore County Board of Elections (Weaver, Warren)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry S Johnson on behalf of Baltimore County Board of Elections (Johnson, Harry)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Baltimore County, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Lias Booker, Ava)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Baltimore County, Maryland.(Lias Booker, Ava)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION by Baltimore County Board of Elections(Nichols, Aaron)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Andrew Nichols on behalf of Baltimore County Board of Elections (Nichols, Aaron)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF CORRECTED EXHIBITS) (Freedman, John)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kathryn M Barber. Directing attorney Kathryn M Barber to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/21/2022. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of William S. Cooper, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Matthew A. Barreto, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Anthony S. Fugett, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Lawrence T. Brown, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, John)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kathryn M. Barber (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9707521.) by Baltimore County, Maryland, Cathy Bevins, Todd K. Crandell, Julian E. Jones, Wade Kach, David Marks, Izzy Patoka, Tom Quirk (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Melissa)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 1/19/2022. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Telephone Conference held on 1/19/2022 before Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby.(Court Reporter: Nadine Bachmann) (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 QC NOTICE: #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Anthony Fugett, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Gerald Morrison, Common Cause Maryland, Dana Vickers Shelley, Danita Tolson, Niesha McCoy needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson(Freedman, John)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Mazzullo (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9703283.) by Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson(Freedman, John)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by Baltimore County, Maryland, Cathy Bevins, Todd K. Crandell, Julian E. Jones, Wade Kach, David Marks, Izzy Patoka, Tom Quirk of Defendants' Intention to File a Motion to Dismiss (Lias Booker, Ava)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tierney Peprah on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Peprah, Tierney)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Ava E Lias Booker on behalf of Baltimore County, Maryland, Cathy Bevins, Todd K. Crandell, Julian E. Jones, Wade Kach, David Marks, Izzy Patoka, Tom Quirk (Lias Booker, Ava)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa O Martinez on behalf of Baltimore County, Maryland, Cathy Bevins, Todd K. Crandell, Julian E. Jones, Wade Kach, David Marks, Izzy Patoka, Tom Quirk (Martinez, Melissa)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER scheduling a telephonic pre-motion status conference. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 1/6/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Request for Pre-Motion Conference and Notice of Intention to File a Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Freedman, John)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danita Tolson, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dana Vickers Shelley, Common Cause Maryland, Gerald Morrison, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Niesha McCoy, Anthony Fugett. Baltimore County Board of Elections waiver sent on 12/30/2021, answer due 2/28/2022.(Freeman, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danita Tolson, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dana Vickers Shelley, Common Cause Maryland, Gerald Morrison, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Niesha McCoy, Anthony Fugett. Wade Kach served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022.(Freeman, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danita Tolson, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dana Vickers Shelley, Common Cause Maryland, Gerald Morrison, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Niesha McCoy, Anthony Fugett. Tom Quirk served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022.(Freeman, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danita Tolson, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dana Vickers Shelley, Common Cause Maryland, Gerald Morrison, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Niesha McCoy, Anthony Fugett. Todd K. Crandell served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022.(Freeman, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danita Tolson, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dana Vickers Shelley, Common Cause Maryland, Gerald Morrison, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Niesha McCoy, Anthony Fugett. Julian E. Jones served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022.(Freeman, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danita Tolson, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dana Vickers Shelley, Common Cause Maryland, Gerald Morrison, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Niesha McCoy, Anthony Fugett. Izzy Patoka served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022.(Freeman, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danita Tolson, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dana Vickers Shelley, Common Cause Maryland, Gerald Morrison, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Niesha McCoy, Anthony Fugett. David Marks served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022.(Freeman, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danita Tolson, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dana Vickers Shelley, Common Cause Maryland, Gerald Morrison, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Niesha McCoy, Anthony Fugett. Cathy Bevins served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022.(Freeman, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danita Tolson, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dana Vickers Shelley, Common Cause Maryland, Gerald Morrison, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Niesha McCoy, Anthony Fugett. Baltimore County, Maryland served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022.(Freeman, Andrew)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Douglas Colley on behalf of Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Sharon Blake, Common Cause Maryland, Anthony Fugett, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Niesha McCoy, Gerald Morrison, Dana Vickers Shelley, Charles Sydnor, Danita Tolson (Colley, Mark)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 12/28/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore County Board of Elections, Baltimore County, Maryland, Cathy Bevins, Todd K. Crandell, Julian E. Jones, Wade Kach, David Marks, Izzy Patoka, Tom Quirk.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew David Freeman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Freeman, Andrew)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A Jeon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jeon, Deborah)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Baltimore County Board of Elections, Baltimore County, Maryland, Cathy Bevins, David Marks, Izzy Patoka, Julian E. Jones, Jr., Todd K. Crandell, Tom Quirk, Wade Kach filed by Danita Tolson, League of Women Voters of Baltimore County, Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Dana Vickers Shelley, Common Cause Maryland, Gerald Morrison, Sharon Blake, Charles Sydnor, Niesha McCoy, Anthony Fugett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons')(Freedman, John)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number 0416-9667484(Freedman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. Baltimore County, Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baltimore County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Mark Douglas Colley
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Tierney Peprah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Baltimore County
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Mark Douglas Colley
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Tierney Peprah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Common Cause Maryland
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Mark Douglas Colley
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Tierney Peprah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Sydnor
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Mark Douglas Colley
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Tierney Peprah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Fugett
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Mark Douglas Colley
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Tierney Peprah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Vickers Shelley
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Mark Douglas Colley
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Tierney Peprah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danita Tolson
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Mark Douglas Colley
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Tierney Peprah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Blake
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Mark Douglas Colley
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Tierney Peprah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Morrison
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Mark Douglas Colley
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Tierney Peprah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niesha McCoy
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Mark Douglas Colley
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Tierney Peprah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County, Maryland
Represented By: Ava E Lias Booker
Represented By: Kathryn M Barber
Represented By: Melissa O Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian E. Jones, Jr., in his official capacity as Chairman of the Baltimore County Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Quirk, in his official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Izzy Patoka, in his official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Kach, in his official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marks, in his official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Bevins, in her official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd K. Crandell, in his official capacity as Member of the Baltimore County Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Board of Elections
Represented By: Harry S Johnson
Represented By: Aaron Andrew Nichols
Represented By: Warren N Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian E. Jones
Represented By: Ava E Lias Booker
Represented By: Kathryn M Barber
Represented By: Melissa O Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Quirk
Represented By: Ava E Lias Booker
Represented By: Kathryn M Barber
Represented By: Melissa O Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Izzy Patoka
Represented By: Ava E Lias Booker
Represented By: Kathryn M Barber
Represented By: Melissa O Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Kach
Represented By: Ava E Lias Booker
Represented By: Kathryn M Barber
Represented By: Melissa O Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marks
Represented By: Ava E Lias Booker
Represented By: Kathryn M Barber
Represented By: Melissa O Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Bevins
Represented By: Ava E Lias Booker
Represented By: Kathryn M Barber
Represented By: Melissa O Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd K. Crandell
Represented By: Ava E Lias Booker
Represented By: Kathryn M Barber
Represented By: Melissa O Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?