American Truck & Bus, Inc. v. Daimler Vans USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Truck & Bus, Inc. dba American Sprinter Sales and American Truck & Bus, Inc. doing business as American Sprinter Sales
Defendant: Daimler Vans USA LLC and Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03236
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Referring Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mercedes Benz, USA, LLC, Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation, Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz Group AG, Corporate Parent Daimler International Nederland B.V., for Mercedes-Benz USA LLC.(Redd, Justin)
February 8, 2022 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Daimler Vans USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mercedes Benz USA, LLC, Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation, Corporate Parent Daimler International Nederland B.V., Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz Group AG, Other Affiliate Mercedes Benz USA, LLC for Daimler Vans USA LLC.(Redd, Justin)
February 8, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Akihiko Redd on behalf of All Defendants (Redd, Justin)
February 8, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip M Andrews on behalf of All Defendants (Andrews, Philip)
February 8, 2022 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Truck & Bus, Inc.. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC waiver sent on 12/22/2021, answer due 2/22/2022.(Glikin, Joshua)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Truck & Bus, Inc.. Daimler Vans USA LLC waiver sent on 12/22/2021, answer due 2/22/2022.(Glikin, Joshua)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sarah J Horner, Paul R Norman. Directing attorney Sarah J Horner, Paul R Norman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sarah J Horner, Paul R Norman. Directing attorney Sarah J Horner, Paul R Norman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/23/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah J. Horner (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9670597.) by American Truck & Bus, Inc.(Glikin, Joshua)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul R. Norman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9670590.) by American Truck & Bus, Inc.(Glikin, Joshua)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Daimler Vans USA LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 12/22/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. American Truck & Bus, Inc. or counsel for American Truck & Bus, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/5/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Truck & Bus, Inc. dba American Sprinter Sales (Glikin, Joshua)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daimler Vans USA LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9667767.), filed by American Truck & Bus, Inc. dba American Sprinter Sales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Glikin, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Truck & Bus, Inc. v. Daimler Vans USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Truck & Bus, Inc. dba American Sprinter Sales
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Glikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Truck & Bus, Inc. doing business as American Sprinter Sales
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Glikin
Represented By: Paul R Norman
Represented By: Sarah J Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Vans USA LLC
Represented By: Justin Akihiko Redd
Represented By: Philip M Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Represented By: Justin Akihiko Redd
Represented By: Philip M Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?