Alvarenga Melgar et al v. CCC USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Enahu Alvarenga Melgar, Jesus Emmanuel Alvarenga Melgar and Demly Sarahi Alvarenga Melgar
Defendant: CCC USA LLC and Nilton Cezar Siqueria
Case Number: 1:2022cv00283
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Enahu Alvarenga Melgar. Nilton Cezar Siqueria served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022.(Melehy, Omar)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to CCC USA LLC, Nilton Cezar Siqueria. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 -FILED IN CLERK'S ERROR- Summons Issued 21 days as to CCC USA LLC, Nilton Cezar Siqueria. (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/3/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9732493.), filed by Kevin Enahu Alvarenga Melgar. (Attachments: #1 Summons As to CCC USA LLC, #2 Summons As to Nilton Cezar Siqueira, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Melehy, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarenga Melgar et al v. CCC USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Enahu Alvarenga Melgar
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Emmanuel Alvarenga Melgar
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demly Sarahi Alvarenga Melgar
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCC USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilton Cezar Siqueria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?