Sarahong et al v. Smartlink, LLC
Plaintiff: Phajeemas Sarahong, Lucie Saether and Kayla Cassano
Defendant: Smartlink, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00328
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally and Issuance of Court-Authorized Notice filed by Smartlink, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Gittins, Robert)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #17 Status Report Submitted filed by Smartlink, LLC. Defendant's response to plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification is due by no later than April 7, 2022, and plaintiffs' reply is due by no later than April 28, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 3/24/2022. (dwcs, Chambers)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Status Report Submitted Joint Status Report by Smartlink, LLC (Gittins, Robert)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally by Phajeemas Sarahong (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Benjamin)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER regarding informal discovery dispute procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 3/14/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER regarding proposed scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Draft Scheduling Order)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 3/10/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, To Plaintiffs' Collective and Class Complaint for Wages Owed by Smartlink, LLC.(Gittins, Robert)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Smartlink, LLC or counsel for Smartlink, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/22/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Smartlink, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Travelers for Smartlink, LLC.(Gittins, Robert)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M Gittins on behalf of Smartlink, LLC (Gittins, Robert)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phajeemas Sarahong. Smartlink, LLC served on 2/15/2022, answer due 3/8/2022.(Davis, Benjamin)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Kayla Cassano of Consent to become a Party Plaintiff (Davis, Benjamin)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 2/8/2022. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Lucie Saether, Phajeemas Sarahong or counsel for Lucie Saether, Phajeemas Sarahong are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/22/2022. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Smartlink, LLC.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Jury Trial Demand by Lucie Saether, Phajeemas Sarahong(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smartlink, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9740095.), filed by Phajeemas Sarahong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent Form, #3 Exhibit Consent Form, #4 Summons)(Davis, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarahong et al v. Smartlink, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phajeemas Sarahong
Represented By: Benjamin L Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucie Saether
Represented By: Benjamin L Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Cassano
Represented By: Benjamin L Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smartlink, LLC
Represented By: Robert M Gittins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?