Cherry v. Barnhart
Plaintiff: Maxine Tiara Cherry
Defendant: JoAnne Barnhart
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 1:2022cv00528
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Brendan Abell Hurson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision (regarding payment of benefits)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 3/22/2022. (c/m 3/22/2022)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2022 Filing 6 Consent to Magistrate Judge (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 3/10/2022. (c/m 3/10/2022) (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Brendan A. Hurson. Pursuant to Standing Order 2021-12, which can be downloaded #here, Maxine Tiara Cherry or counsel for Maxine Tiara Cherry has 30 days from the date of this notice to file their consent or declination to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent or declination, go to Civil > Correspondence > Magistrate Judge - consent/decline. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/4/2022. (c/m 3/4/2022 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Kelly M Marzullo on behalf of JoAnne Barnhart. (c/m 3/4/2022 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maxine Tiara Cherry.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JoAnne Barnhart, filed by Maxine Tiara Cherry. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2022: #5 Corrected Main Document) (ybs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry v. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Tiara Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoAnne Barnhart
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?