Dominion Financial Services, LLC. v. Pavlovsky et al
Plaintiff: Dominion Financial Services, LLC.
Defendant: Alexander Pavlovsky, Konstantin Pavlovsky, Willman Jose Cabrera, Independent Title of Fort Lauderdale, Inc., Kendall Miami Land, LLC, Miami42, LLC, Miami15th Developers, LLC, 5421 NW5, LLC, GST Development, Inc, Rubakha Realty, Inc, NW 4th Land, LLC, 6811 Project, LLC, 540 NW 69th St, LLC, HT Project, LLC, 57th Land, LLC, 78 NE 57th LLC, Rubakha Realty, LLC, MPAV Realty, LLC and 5437 NW5, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00705
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Referring Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dominion Financial Services, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Email w-Counsel)(Gaumont, Robert)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 QC NOTICE: #13 Affidavit of Service, filed by Dominion Financial Services, LLC. was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file using the event "Return of Service Executed" and indicate the date of service and follow prompts to set answer deadline. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Dominion Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumont, Robert)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Dominion Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumont, Robert)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Dominion Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaumont, Robert)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons served on Alexander Pavlovsky, Konstantin Pavlovsky, Rubakha Realty LLC, Miami42 LLC, HT Project LLC, 6811 Project LLC, 5437 NW5 LLC, and 78 NE 57th LLC via counsel James R. Lisa, Esq. on 3/29/2022, filed by Dominion Financial Services, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Email w-Counsel)(Gaumont, Robert) Modified on 5/12/2022 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dominion Financial Services, LLC.. (Gaumont, Robert)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR per counsel- all affidavits were not attached. Will re-file) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dominion Financial Services, LLC.. 540 NW 69th St, LLC served on 5/4/2022, answer due 5/25/2022; 5421 NW5, LLC served on 4/15/2022, answer due 5/6/2022; 5437 NW5, LLC served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022; 57th Land, LLC served on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; 6811 Project, LLC served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022; 78 NE 57th LLC served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022; Willman Jose Cabrera served on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; GST Development, Inc served on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; HT Project, LLC served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022; Independent Title of Fort Lauderdale, Inc. served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/26/2022; Kendall Miami Land, LLC served on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; Miami15th Developers, LLC served on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; Miami42, LLC served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022; NW 4th Land, LLC served on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022; Alexander Pavlovsky served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022; Konstantin Pavlovsky served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022; Rubakha Realty, LLC served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022.(Gaumont, Robert) Modified on 5/9/2022 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant Independent Title of Fort Lauderdale, Inc.'s #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 5/6/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Independent Title of Fort Lauderdale, Inc. answer due 5/26/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Independent Title of Fort Lauderdale, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading)(Thomas, Diana)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Independent Title of Fort Lauderdale, Inc. (Thomas, Diana)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Margeaux Thomas on behalf of Independent Title of Fort Lauderdale, Inc. (Thomas, Diana)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 3/24/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Dominion Financial Services, LLC. or counsel for Dominion Financial Services, LLC. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/7/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to 540 NW 69th St, LLC, 5421 NW5, LLC, 5437 NW5, LLC, 57th Land, LLC, 6811 Project, LLC, 78 NE 57th LLC, Willman Jose Cabrera, GST Development, Inc, HT Project, LLC, Independent Title of Fort Lauderdale, Inc., Kendall Miami Land, LLC, MPAV Realty, LLC, Miami15th Developers, LLC, Miami42, LLC, NW 4th Land, LLC, Alexander Pavlovsky, Konstantin Pavlovsky, Rubakha Realty, Inc, Rubakha Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Dominion Financial Services, LLC. re #1 Complaint,,,, Civil Cover Sheet (Gaumont, Robert)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9834028.), filed by Dominion Financial Services, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit)(Gaumont, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominion Financial Services, LLC. v. Pavlovsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominion Financial Services, LLC.
Represented By: Robert A Gaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Pavlovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konstantin Pavlovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willman Jose Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Title of Fort Lauderdale, Inc.
Represented By: Diana Margeaux Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Miami Land, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami42, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami15th Developers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5421 NW5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GST Development, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubakha Realty, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NW 4th Land, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6811 Project, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 540 NW 69th St, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HT Project, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 57th Land, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 78 NE 57th LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubakha Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPAV Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5437 NW5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?