Friedler et al v. Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. et al
Petitioner: Stanley Friedler, M.D., Gail Friedler, Richard Friedler, Milan Wister, M.D., Amy Wister, Philip Konits, M.D., Cindy Konits and Gordon Boone
Respondent: Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. and Coleman Joseph Devlin
Case Number: 1:2022cv00752
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/26/2022. (vals, Chambers)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. re #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate Proposed Order on Consent Motion for Extension (Donovan, Priscilla)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 QC NOTICE: #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #18 Motion. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate by Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc.(Donovan, Priscilla)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/23/2022. (vals, Chambers)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donovan, Priscilla)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate , #1 MOTION to Vacate. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/27/2022. (vals, Chambers)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate by Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donovan, Priscilla)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Edwin A Zipf. Directing attorney Edwin A Zipf to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2022. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as #1 MOTION to Vacate. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/8/2022. (vals, Chambers)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate by Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donovan, Priscilla)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edwin A. Zipf (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-9864994.) by Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc.(Donovan, Priscilla)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Donovan on behalf of Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. (Donovan, Daniel)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp., Other Affiliate Broadway Air Corp., Other Affiliate KBW, LLC, Other Affiliate Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., Other Affiliate KBW Asset Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Miller Buckfire & Company, LLC, Other Affiliate 1919 Services Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Aviation Asset Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Aviation Finance Acquisition, LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Aviation Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Bank & Trust, Other Affiliate Stifel Bank Community Development Corporation, Other Affiliate Stifel Nicolaus Europe Limited, Other Affiliate Thomas Weisel Capital Management LLC, Other Affiliate SBT Investments - REIT, Inc., Other Affiliate SBT REIT, Inc., Other Affiliate Stifel Bank, Other Affiliate Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Other Affiliate KCP Fund General Partner LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Nicolaus Insurance Agency Incorporated, Other Affiliate Stifel Nicolaus Israel Ltd., Other Affiliate Thomas Weisel Strategic Opportunities Partners LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Bancorp, Inc., Other Affiliate Stifel Bank - CDC -501 N Broadway, Inc., Other Affiliate Maryland Land Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Trust Company Delaware, National Association, Other Affiliate 1919 Investment Counsel LLC, Other Affiliate Rand Wealth, LLC, Other Affiliate B & F Capital Markets, LLC, Other Affiliate EquityCompass Investment Management, LLC, Other Affiliate First Empire Holding Corp., Other Affiliate First Empire Securities, Inc., Other Affiliate Intyce LLC, Other Affiliate KBW Ventures, Inc., Other Affiliate MB Advisory Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Mooreland Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate North Atlantic Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Access Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Europe Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Mooreland Partners LLP, Other Affiliate Stifel Europe Bank AG, Other Affiliate Stifel Schweiz AG, Other Affiliate Stifel Gateway Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Independent Advisors, LLC (fka Century Securities Associates, Inc.), Other Affiliate Stifel Syndicated Credit LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Venture Corp., Other Affiliate Stifel Aviation Opportunities Fund I, LLC, Other Affiliate SBT-Jet, LLC, Other Affiliate Jet Engine Holding S.a.r.l., Other Affiliate FAN Engine Securitization Limited, Other Affiliate FAN Leasing Dublin Limited, Other Affiliate FAN Leasing Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate FAN Leasing Ireland II Limited, Other Affiliate FAN Leasing Ireland III Limited, Other Affiliate Stifel Nicolaus Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate Vining Sparks IBG LLC, Other Affiliate Vining Sparks Interest Rate Products, LLC, Other Affiliate Washington Crossing Advisors, LLC, Other Affiliate Stifel Trust Company, National Assocation for Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc..(Donovan, Priscilla)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR - Counsel will refile) NOTICE of Appearance by Priscilla Alden Donovan on behalf of Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. (Donovan, Priscilla) Modified on 4/7/2022 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Priscilla Alden Donovan on behalf of Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. (Donovan, Priscilla)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Friedler, M.D., et al as to Stifel, Nicolas & Company, Inc. and Coleman Devlin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Coleman Devlin)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #2 Petitioner's Local Rule 105.3 Request for Permission to File a Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award that Exceeds 35 Pages in Length. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/30/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Coleman Joseph Devlin, Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc..(dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 14637132074 (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Petitioner's Local Rule 105.3 Request for Permission to File a Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award that Exceeds 35 Pages in Length. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award by Gordon Boone, Gail Friedler, Richard Friedler, Stanley Friedler, M.D., Cindy Konits, Philip Konits, M.D., Amy Wister, Milan Wister, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment List of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12 #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31 #34 Cover Letter, #35 Civil Cover Sheet, #36 Summons) (dm4s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friedler et al v. Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley Friedler, M.D.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Miller
Represented By: Kevin David Stern
Represented By: Kristofer Patrick Cubello
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gail Friedler
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Miller
Represented By: Kevin David Stern
Represented By: Kristofer Patrick Cubello
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Friedler
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Miller
Represented By: Kevin David Stern
Represented By: Kristofer Patrick Cubello
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Milan Wister, M.D.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Miller
Represented By: Kevin David Stern
Represented By: Kristofer Patrick Cubello
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amy Wister
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Miller
Represented By: Kevin David Stern
Represented By: Kristofer Patrick Cubello
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Philip Konits, M.D.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Miller
Represented By: Kevin David Stern
Represented By: Kristofer Patrick Cubello
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cindy Konits
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Miller
Represented By: Kevin David Stern
Represented By: Kristofer Patrick Cubello
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gordon Boone
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Miller
Represented By: Kevin David Stern
Represented By: Kristofer Patrick Cubello
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stifel, Nicolaus, & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Donovan
Represented By: Priscilla Alden Donovan
Represented By: Edwin A Zipf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Coleman Joseph Devlin
Represented By: Daniel J Donovan
Represented By: Priscilla Alden Donovan
Represented By: Edwin A Zipf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?