Advance Medical Designs, Inc. v. Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC
Counter Defendant: Advance Medical Designs, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00789
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/25/2022. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order and approving the schedule proposed therein. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/25/2022. (vals, Chambers)
May 23, 2022 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Scheduling Order by Advance Medical Designs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunlap, Thomas)
May 23, 2022 Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of William B Dyer, III. Directing attorney William B Dyer, III to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2022. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2022 Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ryan Gentes. Directing attorney Ryan Gentes to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2022. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan P. Gentes (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-9936294.) by Advance Medical Designs, Inc.(Dunlap, Thomas)
May 16, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William B. Dyer III (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-9936230.) by Advance Medical Designs, Inc.(Dunlap, Thomas)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 9/21/2022. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/9/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Advance Medical Designs, Inc..(Dunlap, Thomas)
May 6, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Dunlap on behalf of Advance Medical Designs, Inc. (Dunlap, Thomas)
April 20, 2022 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael P Dulin. Directing attorney Michael P Dulin to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. Signed by Clerk on 4/20/2022. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2022 Filing 19 Corrected ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Advance Medical Designs, Inc. by Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Blum, Daniel)
April 18, 2022 (FILED IN ERROR)Deficiency Notice as to --Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/25/2022 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/18/2022 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 15, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael P. Dulin (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-9880424.) by Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC(Blum, Daniel)
April 15, 2022 Filing 17 (FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Advance Medical Designs, Inc. by Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Blum, Daniel) Modified on 4/18/2022 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jack Blum on behalf of Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC (Blum, Daniel)
April 13, 2022 Filing 15 Transfer Notification Letter Sent to William Brownell Dyer, III (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 4.13.2022)
April 13, 2022 Filing 14 Transfer Notification Sent to Ryan Gentes(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 4.13.2022)
April 13, 2022 Filing 13 Transfer Notification Sent to Joseph C. Sharp. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 4.13.2022)
April 13, 2022 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR)Transfer Notification Sent to Ryan Gentes. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 4.13.2022) Modified on 4/13/2022 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 1, 2022 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04416. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Dismiss. The Court declines to dismiss the case outright. Finding that it lacks personal jurisdiction over Corbin, the Court will instead transfer the case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) to the District of Maryland.6 The Clerk is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland and close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 4/1/2022. (dmb)
April 1, 2022 Case electronically transferred to District of USDC District of Maryland. (dmb)
April 1, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
February 1, 2022 Submission of #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer, #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #9 Reply Brief to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC. (Sharp, Joseph)
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Advance Medical Designs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William B. Dyer III)(Gentes, Ryan)
January 3, 2022 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
December 31, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC. (Sharp, Joseph)
December 31, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer with Brief In Support by Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer)(Sharp, Joseph)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Advance Medical Designs, Inc.. Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC waiver mailed on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Gentes, Ryan)
October 26, 2021 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Advance Medical Designs, Inc.. (Gentes, Ryan)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment with Jury Demand filed by Advance Medical Designs, Inc.. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11347244) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -US Patent No. 10,064,081, #2 Exhibit -B -August 12, 2020 Letter, #3 Exhibit -C -October 5, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit -D - December 7, 2020 Letter, #5 Exhibit -E -January 14, 2021 Letter, #6 Exhibit -F - September 30, 2021 Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advance Medical Designs, Inc. v. Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Advance Medical Designs, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Gentes
Represented By: Thomas M Dunlap
Represented By: William B Dyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Corbin Clinical Resources, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jack Blum
Represented By: Michael P Dulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?