Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services et al
Plaintiff: Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and Chiquita Brooks-LaSure
Case Number: 1:2022cv00977
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Matthew James Maddox
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedures Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part #18 Motion for Extension of Time to answer the Complaint and to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 6/14/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services.(Nichols, Roann)
June 6, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Hughes, Paul)
June 2, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nichols, Roann)
May 24, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul)
May 20, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. All Defendants.(Kimberly, Michael)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 5/20/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Roann Nichols on behalf of All Defendants (Nichols, Roann)
April 29, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. All Defendants.(Hughes, Paul)
April 26, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued 60 days as to Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Kimberly on behalf of Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Kimberly, Michael)
April 22, 2022 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Vanda Pharmaceuticals Limited, Other Affiliate Vanda Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Other Affiliate Vanda Pharmaceuticals Germany GmbH, Other Affiliate Vanda Pharmaceuticals Netherlands B.V. for Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Hughes, Paul)
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, proposed summonses for the U.S. Attorney and Attorney General to be served in addition to the named defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Att'y)(Hughes, Paul)
April 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox. Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. or counsel for Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/6/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 4/22/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2022 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Corporate parents an/or affiliates must be added when the disclosure is filed. Please refile and add them on behalf of the party. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2022 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint,, filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summonses for the U.S. Attorney and Attorney General to be served in addition to the named defendants. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summonses for the U.S. Attorney and Attorney General to be served in addition to the named defendant using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summonses for the U.S. Attorney and Attorney General to be served in addition to the named defendant to #1 Complaint. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 [FILED IN ERROR] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Hughes, Paul) Modified on 4/22/2022 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk).
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9889629.), filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CMS, #3 Summons Brooks-LaSure, #4 Exhibit A-AstraZeneca Comments, #5 Exhibit B-Biogen Comments, #6 Exhibit C-Purdue Comments, #7 Exhibit D-ViiV Healthcare Comments, #8 Exhibit E-HIV + Hep Comments, #9 Exhibit F-Lupus Foundation Comments, #10 Exhibit G-Mental Health America Comments, #11 Exhibit H-NAMI Comments, #12 Exhibit I-National Health Council Comments, #13 Exhibit J-National Multiple Sclerosis Society Comments, #14 Exhibit K-NORD Comments, #15 Exhibit L- National Psoriasis Foundation Comments)(Hughes, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Ambrose Lyons-Berg
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Represented By: Roann Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brooks-LaSure
Represented By: Roann Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?