Jones v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tiavonde L. Jones
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Asset-Based Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-PA5 and BWW Law Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01987
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Asset-Based Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-PA5, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olsen-Leyden, Maria)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BWW Law Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(Cohen, Matthew)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 [FILED IN ERROR - per counsel] MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, and Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Asset-Based Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-PA5, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC(Olsen-Leyden, Maria) Modified on 8/16/2022 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk).
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 [FILED IN ERROR - per counsel] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Asset-Based Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-PA5, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olsen-Leyden, Maria) Modified on 8/16/2022 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer BWW Law Group, LLC answer due 8/31/2022; HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Asset-Based Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-PA5 answer due 8/31/2022; Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 8/31/2022.. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/15/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion to Shorten Time - as extension of time is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/15/2022.
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Asset-Based Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-PA5, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olsen-Leyden, Maria)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Asset-Based Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-PA5, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olsen-Leyden, Maria)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BWW Law Group, LLC (Cohen, Matthew)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against BWW Law Group, LLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Asset-Based Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-PA5, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed by Tiavonde L. Jones.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Olsen-Leyden, Maria)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement Concerning Removal filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.(Olsen-Leyden, Maria)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-22-000426. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10095459), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Olsen-Leyden, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiavonde L. Jones
Represented By: Gerard P Uehlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Maria Andrea Olsen-Leyden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Asset-Based Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-PA5
Represented By: Maria Andrea Olsen-Leyden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWW Law Group, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?