Bair v. Fowler
Plaintiff: Travis Bair
Defendant: Dave Fowler
Case Number: 1:2022cv03008
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Matthew James Maddox
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Filing 18 Correspondence re: Defendant's Intended Motion to Dismiss (Shea, Matthew)
December 16, 2022 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of Remaining State Court Papers (Attachments: #1 Certification of True Copy, #2 Request for Waiver of Prepaid Costs, #3 Notice of Denial of Petition for Waiver of Costs)(Shea, Matthew)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 12/13/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(C/M 12.14.2022)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing Travis Bair to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/27/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Travis Bair files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 12/8/2022. (c/m 12.8.2022)(CONSENT FORM MAILED 12.8.2022)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #8 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Dave Fowler.(Shea, Matthew)
November 23, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox. Travis Bair or counsel for Travis Bair are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/7/2022. (c/m to P on 11/23/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 Removal Notification Letter. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 11.22.2022)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 11/22/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox. Dave Fowler or counsel for Dave Fowler are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/6/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF WASHINGTON COUNTY, MARYLAND. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION by Dave Fowler (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Dave Fowler (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued 30 days as to Dave Fowler.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Dave Fowler, filed by Travis Bair.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by Dave Fowler (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shea, Matthew)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of State Court Papers(Shea, Matthew)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court for Washington County, Maryland, case number D112CV22009187., filed by Dave Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Scope Certification, #4 Complaint as filed in State Court, #5 Writ of Summons as filed in State Court)(Shea, Matthew)
November 21, 2022 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox. (kos, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bair v. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Bair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Fowler
Represented By: Matthew T. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?