Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC v. The Johns Hopkins University
Plaintiff: Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins University
Case Number: 1:2022cv03059
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Referring Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC. The Johns Hopkins University waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023.(Manley, Kwame)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 12/14/2022. (mg4s, Chambers)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued 21 days as to The Johns Hopkins University.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC re #1 Complaint, Summons (filed per Docket No. 6) (Manley, Kwame)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - summons. To correct this problem, file summons using the event Notice (Other) and link summons to #1 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/29/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC or counsel for Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/13/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint, filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC (Manley, Kwame)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC (Manley, Kwame)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Johns Hopkins University, filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manley, Kwame)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number AMDDC-10291676(Manley, Kwame)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC v. The Johns Hopkins University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC
Represented By: Kwame J Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?