Curd v. Papa John's International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frances Curd
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc. and Papa John's International, Inc. doing business as Papa Johns
Case Number: 1:2022cv03185
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Julie Rebecca Rubin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fr Fed. Question: Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RULE 42(b) MANDATE of USCA as to #28 Notice of Appeal filed by Frances Curd. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER of USCA Granting motion to voluntarily dismiss this case pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procdure as to #28 Notice of Appeal filed by Frances Curd. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 USCA Case Number 23-2099 for #28 Notice of Appeal filed by Frances Curd - Case Manager - Taylor Barton. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #28 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #27 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Frances Curd. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMDDC-10879934.(Pizzirusso, James)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Defendant's #14 Motion to Dismiss; closing case. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 9/19/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 9/19/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by Papa John's International, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bosset, Eric)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Frances Curd re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Supplemental Authority)(Nathan, Steven)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE by Papa John's International, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bosset, Eric)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE by Frances Curd re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Supplemental Authority)(Nathan, Steven)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by Papa John's International, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authorities, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Supplemental Authorities)(Bosset, Eric)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Papa John's International, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bosset, Eric)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jagher on behalf of Frances Curd (Jagher, Jonathan)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Papa John's International, Inc..(Bosset, Eric)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Frances Curd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nathan, Steven)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Respond and Reply to Defendant's Motion and Memorandum to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #15 : "the Motion"), it is this 24th day of February 2023, ORDERED that the Motion shall be, and is hereby GRANTED; further it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss at ECF No. #14 shall be filed on or before April 3, 2023; and further it is ORDERED that Defendant's Reply shall be filed on or before April 28, 2023. Signed by United States District Court Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 2/24/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Frances Curd (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pizzirusso, James)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Papa John's International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bosset, Eric)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. 11; "the Motion"), it is this 30th day of December 2022 hereby ORDERED that the Motion shall be, and is hereby GRANTED; and further it is ORDERED that Defendant shall have through and including February 17, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint at ECF No. 1. Signed by United States District Court Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ziwei Song. Directing attorney Ziwei Song to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/29/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Papa John's International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bosset, Eric)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Papa John's International, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Papa John's USA, Inc. for Papa John's International, Inc..(Bosset, Eric)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ziwei Song (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10346453.) by Papa John's International, Inc.(Bosset, Eric)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C Bosset on behalf of Papa John's International, Inc. (Bosset, Eric)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frances Curd. Papa John's International, Inc. served on 12/14/2022, answer due 1/4/2023.(Pizzirusso, James)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven Mark Nathan. Directing attorney Steven Mark Nathan to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/15/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven M. Nathan (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10325104.) by Frances Curd(Pizzirusso, James)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE re 2 QC Notice filed by Frances Curd. (Pizzirusso, James)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Papa John's International, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 QC NOTICE re: #1 Complaint filed by Frances Curd. **Pursuant to Local Rule 102.2.a, a complaint caption shall contain the names and addresses of all parties and the county of residence. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Papa John's International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10317060.), filed by Frances Curd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Pizzirusso, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curd v. Papa John's International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Curd
Represented By: James J Pizzirusso
Represented By: Steven Mark Nathan
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc. doing business as Papa Johns
Represented By: Ziwei Song
Represented By: Eric C Bosset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?