Hernandez v. Bloomingdale's Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MARILYN HERNANDEZ
Defendant: BLOOMINGDALES INC., Bloomingdale's Inc., BLOOMINGDALES, LLC and BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00519
Filed: February 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Referring Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2023 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marilyn Hernandez. Bloomingdales.com, LLC waiver sent on 11/8/2023, answer due 1/8/2024.(Nathan, Steven)
November 8, 2023 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marilyn Hernandez. Bloomingdales, LLC waiver sent on 11/8/2023, answer due 1/8/2024.(Nathan, Steven)
November 7, 2023 Filing 22 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bloomingdales, LLC, Bloomingdales.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE by Marilyn Hernandez For the clerk to issue summons. (Pizzirusso, James)
November 7, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by Marilyn Hernandez For the clerk to issue summons. (Pizzirusso, James)
November 7, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE by Marilyn Hernandez re #17 Amended Complaint (Redline Copy) (Pizzirusso, James)
November 7, 2023 Filing 18 QC NOTICE: #17 Amended Complaint filed by Marilyn Hernandez needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please file the redline version using the event "Notice (Other)" and link to #17 amended complaint. Also submit proposed summons for added parties if needed. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2023 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bloomingdale's Inc., BLOOMINGDALES, LLC, BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC, filed by Marilyn Hernandez.(Pizzirusso, James)
October 16, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Bloomingdale's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bosset, Eric)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/18/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 28, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE by Bloomingdale's Inc. of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Bosset, Eric)
April 25, 2023 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey Huberman. Directing attorney Jeffrey Huberman to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey L. Huberman (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10560628.) by Bloomingdale's Inc.(Bosset, Eric)
April 20, 2023 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bloomingdale's Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Macy's Inc., Other Affiliate Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Bloomingdale's, LLC for Bloomingdale's Inc..(Bosset, Eric)
April 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C Bosset on behalf of Bloomingdale's Inc. (Bosset, Eric)
March 28, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jagher on behalf of Marilyn Hernandez (Jagher, Jonathan)
March 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Nathan on behalf of Marilyn Hernandez (Nathan, Steven)
March 3, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marilyn Hernandez. Bloomingdale's Inc. waiver sent on 3/2/2023, answer due 5/1/2023.(Pizzirusso, James)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/28/2023. (mg4s, Chambers)
February 28, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Marilyn Hernandez.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 2/27/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Marilyn Hernandez or counsel for Marilyn Hernandez are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/13/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLOOMINGDALES INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10455368.), filed by MARILYN HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Pizzirusso, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Bloomingdale's Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILYN HERNANDEZ
Represented By: James J Pizzirusso
Represented By: Steven M Nathan
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jagher
Represented By: Steven M. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMINGDALES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomingdale's Inc.
Represented By: Eric C Bosset
Represented By: Jeffrey Huberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMINGDALES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?