Jean-Charles et al v. Anderson
Plaintiff: Tracy D. Jean-Charles and Michael V. Kuhn
Defendant: Deborah Marriner Anderson
Case Number: 1:2023cv01041
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Filing 19 Remand Letter to Court from the Clerk (c/m 6/14/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand; remanding case to the Circuit Court for Howard County, Maryland. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/14/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/14/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/13/2023. (vals, Chambers)
May 22, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE (Defendant Objection) in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Deborah Marriner Anderson.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2023 Filing 13 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Deborah Marriner Anderson. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2023 Documents submitted via EDSS. Deborah Marriner Anderson consents to receive notice and service electronically. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2023 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael V Kuhn (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document) (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 4, 2023 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tracy D. Jean-Charles (Johnson, Christine)
April 28, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
April 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tracy D. Jean-Charles (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Ex 1 Deed, #4 Exhibit Ex 2 Full Order to Docket, #5 Exhibit Ex 3 SOT Ward, #6 Exhibit Ex 4 MD case docket, #7 Exhibit Ex 5 BK Pacer, #8 Exhibit Ex 6 Fed docket, #9 Exhibit Ex 7 Order dismissing claims, #10 Exhibit Ex 8 Service Affidavits, #11 Exhibit Ex 9 appeal dismissal)(Johnson, Christine)
April 19, 2023 Filing 10 Removal Notification Letter to Defendant. (c/m P 4/19/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2023 Filing 9 Removal Notification Letter to Plaintiffs. (c/m P 4/19/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/19/2023. (c/m 4/19/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Deborah Marriner Anderson or counsel for Deborah Marriner Anderson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/3/2023. (c/m 4/19/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Tracy D. Jean-Charles or counsel for Tracy D. Jean-Charles are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/3/2023. (c/m 4/19/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Michael V. Kuhn or counsel for Michael V. Kuhn are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/3/2023. (c/m 4/19/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 18, 2023 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (c/m 4/19/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2023 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT (ORDER to Docket Suit Regarding Residential Property) against Deborah Marriner Anderson, filed by Tracy D. Jean-Charles, Michael V. Kuhn.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deborah Marriner Anderson(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Circuit Court of Maryland for Howard County, case number 13C17113555., filed by Tracy D. Jean-Charles, Michael V. Kuhn. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2023 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HOWARD COUNTY. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean-Charles et al v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy D. Jean-Charles
Represented By: Christine N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael V. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Marriner Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?