Commock v. LT. Bunn
Plaintiff: Dwayne Stephen Commock
Defendant: Jessup Correctional Institution and LT. Bunn
Case Number: 1:2023cv01088
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen Lipton Hollander
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dwayne Stephen Commock, #1 Complaint filed by Dwayne Stephen Commock ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 6/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order) (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(C/M to Plaintiff & Finance Officer 6.7.2023)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dwayne Stephen Commock (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Finance Officer at NBCI to file an inmate account summary information sheet and certificate within 21 days. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 5/16/2023. (c/m 5/16/2023)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dwayne Stephen Commock (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order to pay the $402 civil filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis; Defendant Jessup Correctional Institution IS DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 5/1/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(copy mailed of order & IFP 5.1.2023)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 New Case Notification Letter sent to Dwayne Stephen Commock. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 4.24.2023)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jessup Correctional Institution, LT. Bunn, filed by Dwayne Stephen Commock. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commock v. LT. Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Stephen Commock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessup Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?