Johnson v. Wawona Packing Company LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Elana Johnson and Elana H. Johnson
Defendant: Wawona LLC, Wawona Packing Company, LLC, Wawona Farm Corporation, LLC and Gerawan Farming Partners, Inc
Case Number: 1:2023cv01746
Filed: June 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM to Parties re: Informal Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/21/2023. (daws, Chambers)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER ORDER re: Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/21/2023. (daws, Chambers)
August 18, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Duvall Jolicoeur on behalf of All Defendants (Jolicoeur, Emily)
August 18, 2023 Filing 17 QC NOTICE: #16 Notice of Appearance filed by Gerawan Farming Partners, Inc, Wawona Farm Corporation, LLC, Wawona Packing Company, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The appearance of Emily Duvall Jolicouer has not been entered. Each attorney must file their Notice of Appearance using their CM/ECF login credentials. The entry of appearance has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2023 Filing 16 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Malloy Dimaio on behalf of All Defendants (Dimaio, Mary) Modified on 8/18/2023 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/17/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE by Gerawan Farming Partners, Inc, Wawona Farm Corporation, LLC, Wawona Packing Company, LLC Consent to Magistrate Judge (Dimaio, Mary)
August 17, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Gerawan Farming Partners, Inc, Wawona Farm Corporation, LLC, Wawona Packing Company, LLC.(Dimaio, Mary)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/31/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 9 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Elana H. Johnson must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elana H. Johnson. Gerawan Farming Partners, Inc served on 7/28/2023, answer due 8/18/2023; Wawona Farm Corporation, LLC served on 7/28/2023, answer due 8/18/2023; Wawona Packing Company, LLC served on 7/28/2023, answer due 8/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Joyce, Robert)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Elana H. Johnson to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/25/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Elana H. Johnson files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/20/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Gerawan Farming Partners, Inc, Wawona Farm Corporation, LLC, Wawona Packing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elana H. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Redlined Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Joyce, Robert)
July 5, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Wawona LLC. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/5/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Elana H. Johnson or counsel for Elana H. Johnson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/19/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Prayer for Jury Trial against Wawona LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10681552.), filed by Elana Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Joyce, Robert)
June 29, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. (kos, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wawona Packing Company LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elana Johnson
Represented By: Robert E Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elana H. Johnson
Represented By: Robert E Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wawona LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wawona Packing Company, LLC
Represented By: Mary Malloy Dimaio
Represented By: Emily Duvall Jolicoeur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wawona Farm Corporation, LLC
Represented By: Emily Duvall Jolicoeur
Represented By: Mary Malloy Dimaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerawan Farming Partners, Inc
Represented By: Mary Malloy Dimaio
Represented By: Emily Duvall Jolicoeur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?