Schaffer et al v. The Johns Hopkins University
Plaintiff: Kathleen Schaffer and Patricia Patchoski
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins University, THE JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION and The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv02099
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed Second Motion to Stay Deadline to Respond to Complaint); STAYING case. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/29/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed Second Motion to Stay Deadline to Respond to Complaint) by The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation, The Johns Hopkins University (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Houghton, James)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, (Johns Hopkins Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadline to Respond to Complaint). Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/28/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2023 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #11 Affidavit of Service filed by Patricia Patchoski, Kathleen Schaffer, #12 Affidavit of Service filed by Patricia Patchoski, Kathleen Schaffer was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Please refile using the event "Summons Returned Executed" located under "Service of Process". It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2023 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR)AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The Johns Hopkins University on 8/14/2023, filed by Patricia Patchoski, Kathleen Schaffer.(Weiner, Courtney) Modified on 8/23/2023 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
August 23, 2023 Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The Johns Hopkins Health System Corp. on 08/10/2023, filed by Patricia Patchoski, Kathleen Schaffer.(Weiner, Courtney) Modified on 8/23/2023 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
August 15, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, (Johns Hopkins Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadline to Respond to Complaint) by The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation, The Johns Hopkins University (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Houghton, James)
August 15, 2023 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Marc Shapiro. Directing attorney Marc Shapiro to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2023 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Aravind Swaminathan. Directing attorney Aravind Swaminathan to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2023 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Johns Hopkins University identifying Other Affiliate JHPIEGO Corporation, Other Affiliate Mt. Washington Campus South Business Trust, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Medicine International, LLC, Other Affiliate DOME Corporation, Other Affiliate The Johns Hopkins Outpatient Center Condominium, Inc., Other Affiliate JHMI Utilities, LLC, Other Affiliate Asthma Center Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Broadway Development Corporation, Other Affiliate CMROC, LLC, Other Affiliate FSK Land Corporation, Other Affiliate Howard County Neonatal Services Series, Other Affiliate JH Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Broadway Acquisition & Development Series, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Medicine Alliance for Patients, LLC, Other Affiliate 11101 Johns Hopkins Road Trust, Other Affiliate Nephrology Investments of Aberdeen, LLC, Other Affiliate JHU Clinical Billing, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Global, Inc., Other Affiliate 2733 North Charles, LLC, Other Affiliate Charles & Blackstone Apartments, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Seton Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate Mt. Washington Campus North Business Trust, Other Affiliate Stafford Apartments, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Health Care and Surgery Center Development, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Surgery Center Series, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Pediatrics at Home, Inc., Other Affiliate 1876 Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate JHU Applied Physics Laboratory, LLC, Other Affiliate JHU Charles Commons, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Global III, Inc., Other Affiliate 2700 Sisson Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 320 W. 29th Street, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins HealthCare, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins HomeCare Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Remington 29th St., LLC, Other Affiliate SP Street Owner, LLC, Other Affiliate Charter Internal Medicine, LLC, Other Affiliate 3111 North Charles Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate 63019 Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Global II, LLC, Other Affiliate 2500 2600 Sisson Street, LLC, Other Affiliate JHOC Condominium, Inc., Other Affiliate Aberdeen Dialysis, LLC, Other Affiliate JHU Medical Retiree Benefit Trust, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins India Private Limited, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins India Foundation, Other Affiliate JHU (USA) Foundation LTD (in the UK), Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins University (Guyana), Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins University Hong Kong. LTD, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Public Health in Nigeria, Other Affiliate 2810 Hampden Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate Fredrick County Neonatal Services Series for The Johns Hopkins University.(Houghton, James)
August 14, 2023 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation identifying Other Affiliate The Johns Hopkins Hospital, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Bayview Medical Center, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Medical Services Corporation, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Employer Health Programs, Other Affiliate Suburban Hospital Healthcare System, Inc., Other Affiliate Mt. Washington Pediatirc Hospital, Other Affiliate All Children's Health System, Inc., Other Affiliate Howard County Health Services, Inc., Other Affiliate HCGH OB/GYN Associates Series, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Medical Mangement Corporation, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Medicine International, LLC, Other Affiliate JH Ventures LLC, Other Affiliate DOME Corporation, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Community Physicians, Inc., Other Affiliate Broadway Development Corporation, Other Affiliate FSK Land Corporation, Other Affiliate Howard County Neonatal Services Series, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Medicine Alliance for Patients, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Surgery Centers Series, Other Affiliate The Lucy Webb Hayes National Training School for Deaconesses and Missionionaries (d/b/a Sibley Memorial Hospital), Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins All Children's Hospital, Inc., Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Health Care and Surgery Center Development, LLC, Other Affiliate JHCSC, LLC, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Healthcare LLC (d/b/a Johns Hopkins Health Plans), Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Home Care Group, Inc. (d/b/a Johns Hopkins Care at Home), Other Affiliate West County Medical, Other Affiliate Johns Hopkins Clinical Alliance, LLC, Other Affiliate JHHS Innovation, LLC, Other Affiliate Howard County General Hospital (d/b/a Johns Hopkins Howard County Medical Center), Other Affiliate Suburban Hospital for The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation.(Houghton, James)
August 14, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Marc Shapiro (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10763380.) by The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation, The Johns Hopkins University(Houghton, James)
August 14, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aravind Swaminathan (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10763357.) by The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation, The Johns Hopkins University(Houghton, James)
August 14, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Houghton on behalf of The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation, The Johns Hopkins University (Houghton, James)
August 7, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation, The Johns Hopkins University.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 4, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Johns Hopkins University, THE JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10746413.), filed by Kathleen Schaffer, Patricia Patchoski. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiner, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaffer et al v. The Johns Hopkins University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Schaffer
Represented By: Courtney Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Patchoski
Represented By: Courtney Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins University
Represented By: James D. Houghton
Represented By: Aravind Swaminathan
Represented By: Marc Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation
Represented By: James D. Houghton
Represented By: Aravind Swaminathan
Represented By: Marc Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?