Goff et al v. Bollinger et al
Plaintiff: Faith Goff and William Metz
Defendant: Marlana Sheridan Bollinger and Wellspring Family Medicine, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02151
Filed: August 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/21/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2023 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Marlana Sheridan Bollinger(Goundry, Frederick)
September 18, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION Waiving Expert Reports by Marlana Sheridan Bollinger(Goundry, Frederick)
September 13, 2023 Filing 17 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Goundry, Frederick)
September 13, 2023 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marlana Sheridan Bollinger, Wellspring Family Medicine, P.C. identifying Corporate Parent Medical Mutual Liabiilty Insurance Society of Maryland for Marlana Sheridan Bollinger, Wellspring Family Medicine, P.C..(Goundry, Frederick)
September 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick W Goundry, III on behalf of Marlana Sheridan Bollinger, Wellspring Family Medicine, P.C. (Goundry, Frederick)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/26/2024. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/13/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2023 Filing 13 Informal Discovery Letter to Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/13/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2023 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Marlana Sheridan Bollinger was filed incorrectly. **Any entity listed on the Corporate Disclosure should be entered as a corporate parent/other affiliate when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: 8 Notice of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge filed by Wellspring Family Medicine, P.C., Marlana Sheridan Bollinger was filed incorrectly. **Wrong event used to enter appearance. Please use the event Notice of Appearance under Civil Events - Other Filings - Notices. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2023 Filing 10 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Request for Jury Trial by Marlana Sheridan Bollinger.(Goundry, Frederick)
September 13, 2023 Filing 9 [FILED IN ERROR] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marlana Sheridan Bollinger (Goundry, Frederick) Modified on 9/13/2023 (mg3s, Deputy Clerk).
September 13, 2023 Filing 8 [FILED IN ERROR] PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Frederick W Goundry, III on behalf of All Defendants. A certified copy of the transcript of the record is due on 11/13/2023 unless otherwise ordered.(Goundry, Frederick) Modified on 9/13/2023 (mg3s, Deputy Clerk).
September 7, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Metz, Faith Goff. Wellspring Family Medicine, P.C. served on 8/23/2023, answer due 9/13/2023.(MacLellan, John)
September 7, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Metz, Faith Goff. Marlana Sheridan Bollinger served on 8/23/2023, answer due 9/13/2023.(MacLellan, John)
August 14, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Marlana Sheridan Bollinger, Wellspring Family Medicine, P.C.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Faith Goff, William Metz re #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons (Wellspring) (MacLellan, John)
August 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Faith Goff, William Metz re #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons (Bollinger) (MacLellan, John)
August 11, 2023 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Faith Goff, William Metz was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons as to the named Defendants. To correct this problem, file the Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link it to #1 . (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marlana Sheridan Bollinger, Wellspring Family Medicine, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10755468.), filed by William Metz, Faith Goff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(MacLellan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goff et al v. Bollinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Goff
Represented By: Zev Tsevi Gershon
Represented By: John A MacLellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Metz
Represented By: Zev Tsevi Gershon
Represented By: John A MacLellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlana Sheridan Bollinger
Represented By: Frederick W Goundry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellspring Family Medicine, P.C.
Represented By: Frederick W Goundry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?