Earnest v. Ravin Crossbows, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broughton Earnest
Defendant: Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc., Crosman Corporation, BPS DIRECT, L.L.C. d/b/a BASS PRO SHOPS, Ravin Crossbows, LLC doing business as Ravin Crossbows and BPS Direct, LLC doing business as Bass Pro Shops
Case Number: 1:2023cv02871
Filed: October 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Julie Rebecca Rubin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for Mediation. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 12/21/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 12/21/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2023 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT Joint - Initial by Ravin Crossbows, LLC(Sutton, Barry)
December 13, 2023 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven D. Brock. Directing attorney Steven D. Brock to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2023 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Barry B. Sutton. Directing attorney Barry B. Sutton to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 12/12/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 12/12/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven D. Brock (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10982400.) by BPS Direct, LLC, Crosman Corporation, Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc.(McCloskey, Matthew)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Barry B. Sutton (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10982330.) by BPS Direct, LLC, Crosman Corporation, Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc.(McCloskey, Matthew)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Velocity Outdoor, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Compass Diversified Holdings, Other Affiliate Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Other Affiliate CBCP Acquisition Corp., Other Affiliate CDCP Products, LLC, Other Affiliate CBCP Products, LLC, Other Affiliate Compass Group Diversified Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Compass Diversified for Velocity Outdoor, Inc..(McCloskey, Matthew)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ravin Crossbows, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Velocity Outdoor, Inc. for Ravin Crossbows, LLC.(McCloskey, Matthew)
December 12, 2023 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BPS Direct, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Bass Pro, LLC, Other Affiliate Huntsman Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate American Sportsman Holdings Co. for BPS Direct, LLC.(McCloskey, Matthew)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, /Answer to Complaint by Defendant BPS Direct, LLC d/b/a Bass Pro Shops - by BPS Direct, LLC.(McCloskey, Matthew)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, /Answer to Complaint by Defendants Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc. and Crosman Corporation - by Crosman Corporation, Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc..(McCloskey, Matthew)
October 31, 2023 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Monaco. Directing attorney Joseph Monaco to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/24/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Broughton Earnest or counsel for Broughton Earnest are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/7/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to BPS Direct, LLC, Crosman Corporation, Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc..(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Monaco (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10887260.) by Broughton Earnest(Ulwick, James)
October 24, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BPS DIRECT, L.L.C. d/b/a BASS PRO SHOPS, Crosman Corporation, Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Velocity Outdoor, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10885540.), filed by Broughton Earnest. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Ulwick, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earnest v. Ravin Crossbows, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broughton Earnest
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Joseph Monaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravin Crossbows, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Outdoor, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J McCloskey
Represented By: Barry B. Sutton
Represented By: Steven D. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosman Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J McCloskey
Represented By: Barry B. Sutton
Represented By: Steven D. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPS DIRECT, L.L.C. d/b/a BASS PRO SHOPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravin Crossbows, LLC doing business as Ravin Crossbows
Represented By: Matthew J McCloskey
Represented By: Barry B. Sutton
Represented By: Steven D. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPS Direct, LLC doing business as Bass Pro Shops
Represented By: Matthew J McCloskey
Represented By: Barry B. Sutton
Represented By: Steven D. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?