Marcano v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Desiree N Marcano
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv03060
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/19/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2023 Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Remy Higgins. Directing attorney Remy Higgins to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2023 Filing 24 Second CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Remy A. Higgins by Desiree N Marcano. The fee has already been paid.(Jenner, Robert)
December 11, 2023 Filing 23 QC NOTICE: #22 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Desiree N Marcano needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2023 Filing 22 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Remy A. Higgins by Desiree N Marcano. The fee has already been paid.(Jenner, Robert)
December 6, 2023 Filing 21 QC NOTICE: #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Desiree N Marcano needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 5, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Remy A. Higgins (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10967369.) by Desiree N Marcano(Jenner, Robert)
December 1, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Keith Jenner on behalf of Desiree N Marcano (Jenner, Robert)
November 29, 2023 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher S. McRae. Directing attorney Christopher S. McRae to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/29/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher S. McRae (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10942067.) by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC(Dew, Ellen)
November 21, 2023 Filing 16 Correspondence re: Ten Remanded Cases Be Designated As Related (Dew, Ellen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Dew, Ellen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Elizabeth Dew on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Dew, Ellen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Pauline Ain on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Ain, Alexa)
November 15, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P O Day on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (O Day, Michael)
November 9, 2023 Filing 11 Removal Notification Letter sent to Attorney's of Party (c/m 11/09/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2023 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-16860. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(sa)
September 28, 2023 Filing 8 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Brilleaux, Kelly)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Desiree N Marcano against Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.; Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Filed per Rec. Doc. 11790 in 16-md-2740) (ecm)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI)
February 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (tk)
February 1, 2018 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Summons. The pdf should have neither the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action. ** (tk)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg)
December 11, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6531124) filed by Desiree N Marcano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons. Attorney Elizabeth S Dudley added to party Desiree N Marcano(pty:pla).(Dudley, Elizabeth) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/1/2018) (tk). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/1/2018) (tk). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/1/2018) (tk). (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/1/2018) (tk). (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/1/2018) (tk). Modified on 2/1/2018 (tk). Modified on 2/1/2018 (tk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcano v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree N Marcano
Represented By: Remy Higgins
Represented By: Robert Keith Jenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?