King v. State of Maryland
Petitioner: Kyeem King
Respondent: State of Maryland
Case Number: 1:2023cv03232
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Julie Rebecca Rubin
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Recind 8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Response in Opposition to #7 Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time by Kyeem King (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER: Pending before the Court is Respondent's January 9, 2024 motion under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 6(b) for an extension of time within which to file an answer. Having considered the motion, the Court hereby GRANTS the requested extension of time to and including Monday, February 12, 2024, provided, however, that Petitioner may move within 14 days from the date of this order to rescind the order as improvidently granted. Madam Clerk shall provide Mr. King with a copy of this docket entry/order. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 1/10/2024. (c/m p docket sheet 1/10/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiMiceli, Andrew)
December 21, 2023 Filing 6 Supplement (Exhibit #1) to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kyeem King (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2023 Filing 5 Supplement to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kyeem King (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew DiMiceli on behalf of State of Maryland (DiMiceli, Andrew)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing that Respondent shall file a response within 40 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 12/4/2023. (c/m p and c/em as directed 12/4/23 ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 New Case Notification Letter sent to Kyeem King. (c/m p 11/29/23 ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kyeem King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope) (page 1 of exhibit 1 cut off at bottom ols, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kyeem King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Maryland
Represented By: Andrew DiMiceli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?