Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. Wicomico County, Maryland
Plaintiff: Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Caucus of African American Leaders, Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Dr. Eddie Boyd, Luc Angelot, Amber Green and Monica Brooks
Defendant: Wicomico County, Maryland, Wicomico County Board of Education, Wicomico County Board of Elections, N. Eugene Malone, Allen C. Brown, Sr., Dr. Bonnie Ennis, Kristin Hazel, Susan Beauchamp, David A. Plotts, John Palmer, Jared DeMarinis, Michael Summers, William G. Voelp, Janet Millenson and Yaakove Weissmann
Case Number: 1:2023cv03325
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Maddox
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1973 Voting Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Filing 27 Summons Issued 21 days as to Susan Beauchamp, Allen C. Brown, Sr, Jared DeMarinis, Bonnie Ennis, Kristin Hazel, N. Eugene Malone, Janet Millenson, John Palmer, David A. Plotts, Michael Summers, William G. Voelp, Yaakove Weissmann.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin R Cockey, Ashley Ann Bosche on behalf of Wicomico County Board of Elections. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (entered separately per ECF no. 23 Order/Chambers)
January 30, 2024 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Susan Beauchamp, Allen C. Brown, Sr, Jared DeMarinis, Bonnie Ennis, Kristin Hazel, N. Eugene Malone, Janet Millenson, John Palmer, David A. Plotts, Michael Summers, William G. Voelp, Yaakove Weissmann, Wicomico County Board of Education, Wicomico County Board of Elections, Wicomico County, Maryland, filed by Monica Brooks, Caucus of African American Leaders, Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Amber Green, Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Eddie Boyd, Luc Angelot. (Attachments: #1 Red Line Copy)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (entered per ECF no. 23 Order/chambers)
January 30, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE by Luc Angelot, Eddie Boyd, Monica Brooks, Caucus of African American Leaders, Amber Green, Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, N. Eugene Malone, Allen C. Brown, Sr, Bonnie Ennis, Kristin Hazel, Susan Beauchamp, David A. Plotts, John Palmer, Jared DeMarinis, Michael Summers, William G. Voelp, Janet Millenson, Yaakove Weissmann re #22 Notice (Other),, For the Clerk to issue Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons re: William G. Voelp, #2 Summons re: Michael Summers, #3 Summons re: David A. Plotts, #4 Summons re: John Palmer, #5 Summons re: Janet Millenson, #6 Summons re: N. Eugene Malone, #7 Summons re: Kristin Hazel, #8 Summons re: Dr. Bonnie Ennis, #9 Summons re: Jared DeMarinis, #10 Summons re: Allen C. Brown, Sr., #11 Summons re: Susan Beauchamp, #12 Summons Anthony G. Brown)(Freedman, John)
January 30, 2024 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Clerk is directed to docket the First Amended Complaint attached to Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing (ECF 22-1) as the operative complaint in this matter, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), in a separate docket entry. The Clerk is further directed to docket the Entry of Appearance by counsel for Defendant Wicomico County Board of Elections (ECF 21-2) in a separate docket entry. Defendant Wicomico County Board of Education's motion to dismiss (ECF 19) is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant Wicomico County Board of Elections's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF 21) is construed as a request for an extension of time to respond to the First Amended Complaint and is GRANTED. Defendant Wicomico County Board of Elections's answer or motion in response to the First Amended Complaint shall be served and filed no later than March 1, 2024. Signed by United States District Judge Matthew J. Maddox. (sj2s, Chambers)
January 30, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE by Luc Angelot, Eddie Boyd, Monica Brooks, Caucus of African American Leaders, Amber Green, Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People re #19 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' RULE 12 MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. 19) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redline of Amended Complaint)(Freedman, John)
January 23, 2024 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Summons Issued on or about January 3, 2024 by Wicomico County Board of Elections (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Extension, #2 Attachment Entry of Appearance)(Cockey, Robin)
January 16, 2024 Filing 20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wicomico County Board of Education identifying Other Affiliate Maryland Association of Boards of Education Group Insurance Pool for Wicomico County Board of Education.(Scott, Andrew)
January 16, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Wicomico County Board of Education (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Andrew)
January 12, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G Scott on behalf of Wicomico County Board of Education (Scott, Andrew)
January 12, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J O Meally on behalf of Wicomico County Board of Education (O Meally, Edmund)
January 11, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amber Green, Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Monica Brooks, Caucus of African American Leaders, Eddie Boyd, Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Luc Angelot. Wicomico County Board of Education served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024; Wicomico County Board of Elections served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024; Wicomico County, Maryland served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024.(Freedman, John)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #14 Affidavit of Service, filed by Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Eddie Boyd, Monica Brooks, Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Luc Angelot, Caucus of African American Leaders, Amber Green was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file using the event "Summons Returned Executed" and follow the prompts to set answer deadlines. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. Thank you. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Civil Cover Sheet Affidavit and Certificate of Service served on Paul Wilbur, Katrina Purnell, Eugene Malone Jr. on December 29, 2023, filed by Luc Angelot, Eddie Boyd, Monica Brooks, Caucus of African American Leaders, Amber Green, Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People.(Freedman, John)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caucus of African American Leaders (Freedman, John)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance (Freedman, John)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People identifying Corporate Parent National Association for the Advancement of Colored People for Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People.(Freedman, John)
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Mischke. Directing attorney Michael Mischke to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/14/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Mazzullo. Directing attorney Michael Mazzullo to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/14/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2023 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Anora Yangun Wang. Directing attorney Anora Yangun Wang to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/14/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Mischke (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10986256.) by Luc Angelot, Eddie Boyd, Monica Brooks, Caucus of African American Leaders, Amber Green, Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People(Freedman, John)
December 14, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Mazzullo (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10986173.) by Luc Angelot, Eddie Boyd, Monica Brooks, Caucus of African American Leaders, Amber Green, Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People(Freedman, John)
December 14, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anor Yangjun Wang (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10986007.) by Luc Angelot, Eddie Boyd, Monica Brooks, Caucus of African American Leaders, Amber Green, Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People(Freedman, John)
December 14, 2023 Deficiency Notice to applicable Plaintiffs - Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/21/2023 (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2023 Filing fee: $ 13.81, receipt number 6930. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2023 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number AMDDC-10980714(Freedman, John)
December 12, 2023 The case of Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, et al. v Wicomico County, Maryland, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is 23-cv-3325. The filing fee is $405.00, but you were charged $402.00 in error. The incorrect filing fee has been refunded. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Taichi Steiner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Steiner, Nicholas)
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A Jeon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jeon, Deborah)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Wicomico County Board of Education, Wicomico County Board of Elections, Wicomico County, Maryland. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wicomico County, Maryland ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10972977.), filed by Amber Green, Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance, Monica Brooks, Caucus of African American Leaders, Dr. Eddie Boyd, Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Luc Angelot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Paul D. Wilbur, #3 Summons N. Eugene Malone, Jr., #4 Summons Katrina A. Purnell)(Freedman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. Wicomico County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wicomico County Branch of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Anora Yangun Wang
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Michael Mischke
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caucus of African American Leaders
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Anora Yangun Wang
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Michael Mischke
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watchmen with One Voice Ministerial Alliance
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Anora Yangun Wang
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Michael Mischke
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Eddie Boyd
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Anora Yangun Wang
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Michael Mischke
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luc Angelot
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Michael Mischke
Represented By: Anora Yangun Wang
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Green
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Anora Yangun Wang
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Michael Mischke
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Brooks
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Anora Yangun Wang
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Michael Mazzullo
Represented By: Michael Mischke
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wicomico County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wicomico County Board of Education
Represented By: Andrew G Scott
Represented By: Edmund J O Meally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wicomico County Board of Elections
Represented By: Robin R Cockey
Represented By: Ashley Ann Bosche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Eugene Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen C. Brown, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bonnie Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Hazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Plotts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared DeMarinis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Voelp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Millenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaakove Weissmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?