Bradley v. CSX Transportation, Inc
Plaintiff: Nicole L. Bradley and Nichole L. Bradley
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03445
Filed: December 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson on 2/12/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson for Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 2/8/2024. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2024 Filing 20 (FILED IN WRONG CASE PER COUNSEL) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Estelle Askew on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Askew, Amy) Modified on 2/8/2024 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 9/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 2/7/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2024 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT Initial Joint Report Regarding Scheduling Order by CSX Transportation, Inc.(Askew, Amy)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 1/25/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/10/2024; and LETTER setting deadline to review, consult, and file a letter addressing the points outlined therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 1/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Mills Strickland on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Strickland, Bradley)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 1/24/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. or counsel for CSX Transportation, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/6/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2024 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Askew, Amy)
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Askew, Amy)
January 22, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nichole L. Bradley. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024.(Darby, Perry)
December 28, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Nichole L. Bradley re #1 Complaint, with corrected Civil Cover Sheet and Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Corrected Summons)(Darby, Perry)
December 21, 2023 Filing 5 QC NOTICE re: Civil Cover Sheet and Summons attached to #1 Complaint, filed by Nichole L. Bradley. **Counsel called clerk to confirm spelling of Plaintiff's first name is "Nichole" as noted on Complaint and not "Nicole" as noted on Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. Please file a corrected Civil Cover Sheet and Summons using the event "notice (other)" and link corrected Civil Cover Sheet and Summons to #1 complaint. Summons issued at ECF no. #2 has been marked as Filed in Error and the document link has been disabled. Thank you. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 12/21/2023. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Nicole L. Bradley or counsel for Nicole L. Bradley are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/4/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR per counsel- Plaintiff's name was misspelled on proposed summons) Summons Issued 21 days as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/21/2023 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
December 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-10998454.), filed by Nichole L. Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Darby, Perry) Modified on 12/21/2023 to correct spelling of Plaintiff's name) (dass, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. CSX Transportation, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole L. Bradley
Represented By: Perry Matthew Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole L. Bradley
Represented By: Perry Matthew Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Amy Estelle Askew
Represented By: Bradley Mills Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?